Arthur-Nelson v. U.S. Bancorp Government Leasing and Finance, Inc. et al
Appellee: Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Servicing and U.S. Bancorp Government Leasing and Finance, Inc.
Debtor: Tara Retail Group, LLC
Appellant: Constance Arthur-Nelson
Consolidated Plaintiff: George Leeson, The Elswick Company, LLC and Jacob Crum
Interested Party: US Trustee
Case Number: 1:2019cv00167
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Remove Counsel from Cases. Attorney Joshua A. Lanham terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/22/19. (jss)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joshua A. Lanham by U.S. Bancorp Government Leasing and Finance, Inc., Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adkins, J.)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Paul Chronis' #14 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/22/19. (jss)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Paul E. Chronis: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002743 (jss)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul E. Chronis by U.S. Bancorp Government Leasing and Finance, Inc., Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adkins, J.)
October 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Appellant Brief due by 2/3/2020. Appellee Response Brief due by 3/4/2020. Appellant Reply Brief due by 3/19/2020. (cmd)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Meagen Leary's #10 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/16/19. (jss)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Elinor Murarova's #9 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/16/19. (jss)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Filing fees for Elinor Murarova and Meagen Leary: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002739 (jss)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Meagen E. Leary by U.S. Bancorp Government Leasing and Finance, Inc.. (Adkins, J.)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elinor Murarova by U.S. Bancorp Government Leasing and Finance, Inc.. (Adkins, J.)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER CANCELING STATUS CONFERENCE AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULING: The Court CONSOLIDATES 1:19cv167, 1:19cv168, 1:19cv169 for all purposes pursuant toFederal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a), with Civil Action No. 1:19cv167 serving as a the lead case and SETS the following briefing schedule: Appellants opening brief due on February 3, 2020; Appellees response brief due on March 4, 2020; and Appellants reply brief due on March 19, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/15/19. (jss) Modified on 10/15/2019 hard copy to Joshua Lanham and Meagan Leary. (jss).
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT JOINT by Constance Arthur-Nelson, U.S. Bancorp Government Leasing and Finance, Inc., Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Servicing. (Adkins, J.)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER AS DIRECTED: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/18/2019 01:15 PM before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/7/19. (jss)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DISTRICT COURT'S RECEIPT AND FILING OF DESIGNATED RECORD ON APPEAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Bankruptcy Court case number 1:17bk00057. (cnd)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Designated Record on Appeal re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Record on Appeal, #2 Item No. 1 - Notice of Removal, #3 Item No. 2 - Order Granting Motion to Refer, #4 Item No. 3 - Order Providing for Amended Complaint to be Filed and Setting Briefing Schedule, #5 Item No. 4 - Amended Complaint, #6 Item No. 5 - Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #7 Item No. 6 - Plaintiff's Combined Response and Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #8 Item No. 7 - Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #9 Item No. 8 - Order Requiring Defendants Supplement Their Briefing on Motion to Dismiss, #10 Item No. 9 - Brief/Memorandum (Supplemental), #11 Item No. 10 - Response in Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #12 Item No. 11 - Notice of Filing Judgment Order, #13 Item No. 12 - Memorandum Opinion Providing for the Court to Grant the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, #14 Item No. 13 - Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and Dismissing Complaint, #15 Item No. 14 - Notice of Appeal, #16 Item No. 15 - Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to U.S. District Court, #17 Item No. 16 - Clerk's Service of Notice of Appeal, and Notice of Deadlines to Designate the Record and Provide Statement of Issues on Appeal, #18 Item No. 17 - Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal to District Court, #19 Item No. 18 - Appellant Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record on Appeal, #20 Item No. 19 - Statement of Issues on Appeal, #21 Item No. 20 - Certification of No Transcript, #22 Item No. 21 - Appellee Designation of Contents for Inclusion in Record of Appeal, #23 Item No. 22 - Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #24 Item No. 23 - Defendants' Amended Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #25 Item No. 24 - Public Docket Sheet)(cnd) (Attachment 1 replaced to remove fillable document, Attachments 2 and 3 replaced to remove double headers on 10/11/2019) (cnd).
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to P. Chronis and E. Murarova. (jss)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Appeal. (jss)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 1:17-00057. filed by Constance Arthur-Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arthur-Nelson v. U.S. Bancorp Government Leasing and Finance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Gerard M. Stowers
Represented By: Christopher P. Schueller
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: Elinor H. Murarova
Represented By: Paul Chronis
Represented By: Meagen Eileen Leary
Represented By: Joshua A. Lanham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bancorp Government Leasing and Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Gerard M. Stowers
Represented By: Christopher P. Schueller
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Represented By: Elinor H. Murarova
Represented By: Paul Chronis
Represented By: Meagen Eileen Leary
Represented By: Joshua A. Lanham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Tara Retail Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Constance Arthur-Nelson
Represented By: Alex D McLaughlin
Represented By: John H. Skaggs
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: George Leeson
Represented By: Alex D McLaughlin
Represented By: John H. Skaggs
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: The Elswick Company, LLC
Represented By: Alex D McLaughlin
Represented By: John H. Skaggs
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jacob Crum
Represented By: Alex D McLaughlin
Represented By: John H. Skaggs
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US Trustee
Represented By: David L Bissett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?