Langford et al v. Antero Resources Corporation
Plaintiff: Wanda L. Langford, Jack H. Langford, June C. Berkley, William L. Malster, Joseph C. Langford, Joy Sue Malster and Linda A. Langford
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00178
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Glover on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Glover, David)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law In Support of by Antero Resources Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum In Support of)(Smith, Amy)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 11/13/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/2/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/16/2019 03:30 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/16/2019. (wrr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Antero Resources Corporation. (Smith, Amy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorney Keith White. (mh)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Ritchie County Circuit Court, (case number 19-C-25), filed by Antero Resources Corporation.Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2900101. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit a - State Court documents, #2 Proof of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langford et al v. Antero Resources Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda L. Langford
Represented By: Keith White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack H. Langford
Represented By: Keith White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June C. Berkley
Represented By: Keith White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Malster
Represented By: Keith White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph C. Langford
Represented By: Keith White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Sue Malster
Represented By: Keith White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda A. Langford
Represented By: Keith White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation
Represented By: Shaina D. Massie
Represented By: Amy M. Smith
Represented By: W. Henry Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?