Butcher v. The City of Clarksburg et al
Plaintiff: Rosa Lee Butcher
Defendant: Martin Howe, Robert Hilliard, The City of Clarksburg and John Doe(s)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00181
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of The City of Clarksburg, John Doe(s), Martin Howe, Robert Hilliard against Rosa Lee Butcher. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 11/13/19. (mh)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS DKT. NO. #5 AND DISMISSING THE COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE DKT. NO. #1 . The Clerk is directed to enter a separate judgment order in this matter. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/13/19. (mh)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Scheduling Conference held on 11/7/2019. (Court Reporter Stacy Harlow) (dk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Robert Hilliard, Martin Howe, The City of Clarksburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Elshiaty, Matthew)
October 25, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rosa Lee Butcher. (Gentilozzi, Timothy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rosa Lee Butcher. (Gentilozzi, Timothy)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Smith, Shannon)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER (For reasons appearing to the Court, the Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/7/2019, at 3:00 PM, is RESCHEDULED for 11/7/2019, at 11:00 AM, in Judge Keeley's Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley.). Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/23/2019. (dk)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A RESPONSE re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Robert Hilliard, Martin Howe and The City of Clarksburg. Plaintiff's response is due by 10/25/2019, Defendants' shall file their reply no later than 11/1/19. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/17/19. (mh)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Robert Hilliard, Martin Howe, The City of Clarksburg.(Elshiaty, Matthew)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM of Law In Support by Robert Hilliard, Martin Howe, The City of Clarksburg re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Elshiaty, Matthew)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Robert Hilliard, Martin Howe, The City of Clarksburg. (Elshiaty, Matthew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Timothy Gentilozzi. (wrr) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/20/2019 with corrected document) (wrr). NEF regenerated.
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/10/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/24/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 11/7/2019 03:00 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/17/2019. (wrr)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Timothy V. Gentilozzi. (wrr)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Harrison County, WV, (case number 19-C-223), filed by Robert Hilliard, The City of Clarksburg, Martin Howe. Filing Fee $400 PAID - Receipt #0424-2900968. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butcher v. The City of Clarksburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Howe
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Simonton
Represented By: Shannon P. Smith
Represented By: Matthew D. Elshiaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hilliard
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Simonton
Represented By: Shannon P. Smith
Represented By: Matthew D. Elshiaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Clarksburg
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Simonton
Represented By: Shannon P. Smith
Represented By: Matthew D. Elshiaty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Lee Butcher
Represented By: Timothy V Gentilozzi
Represented By: Timothy Victor Gentilozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?