Blanton, II v. Hudgins
Petitioner: John Alvin Blanton, II
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Case Number: 1:2019cv00197
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 Writ of Habeas Corpus Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC002779 (jss)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/31/19. (jss)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/28/19. (jss)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BUT DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5.00 FILING FEE within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 10/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Change of Address, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(copy Petitioner)(cnd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Account Report by John Alvin Blanton, II. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Statement, #2 Envelope)(cnd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION/APPLICATION and Affidavit to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees by John Alvin Blanton, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cnd)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against R. Hudgins, filed by John Alvin Blanton, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)[Kleeh/Aloi/Williams](cnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanton, II v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Alvin Blanton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?