Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Mylan Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00201
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Applications (ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 29 Courtesy Copy of Motion to Transfer filed with the JDML. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment, #9 Attachment)(mh)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 2/4/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/18/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 3/3/2020, at 1:30 PM, in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 3/10/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 12/16/2019. (dk)
December 15, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by William J O'Brien on behalf of Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (O'Brien, William)
December 12, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Mylan Laboratories Limited waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Companion, James)
December 12, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Mylan Inc. waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Companion, James)
December 12, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Companion, James)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Jared L. Stringham to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/6/19. (mh)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Christina Anne Larissa Schwarz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/6/19. (mh)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Gregory J. Manas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/6/19. (mh)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Christopher E. Loh to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/6/19. (mh)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Nicholas N. Kallas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/6/19. (mh)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Susanne Flanders to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/6/19. (mh)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Laura K. Fishwick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/6/19. (mh)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Shannon K. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/6/19. (mh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 PHV Filing fee: $ 1600.00, receipt number WVNC002759 for G. Manas, L. Fishwick, S. Clark, J. Stringham, S. Flanders, C. Loh, C. Schwarz, N. Kallas. (mh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory J. Manas by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Laura K. Fishwick by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shannon K. Clark by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jared L. Stringham by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Susanne Flanders by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher E. Loh by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christina Anne Larissa Schwarz by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas N. Kallas by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Schwarz, Flanders, Clark, Fishwick, and Manas. (dk)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (dk)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental Information for Patent Cases Involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (dk)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (dk)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number WVNW002318. (dk)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent Information, #2 Exhibit B - Patent Information, #3 Exhibit C - Patent Information, #4 Exhibit D - Patent Information, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories Limited
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Jared Stringham
Represented By: Laura K. Fishwick
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Gregory J. Manas
Represented By: Nicholas N. Kallas
Represented By: Susanne L. Flanders
Represented By: Shannon K. Clark
Represented By: Christopher E. Loh
Represented By: Christina Schwarz
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?