AstraZeneca AB et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and AstraZeneca AB
Defendant: mylan inc., Mylan N.V., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and 3M Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00203
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Applications (ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Pizzo on behalf of 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Pizzo, John)
November 12, 2019 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon H. Copland on behalf of 3M Company (Copland, Gordon)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER WAIVING PRO HAC VICE FILINGS AND FEES. The parties will not be required to file pro hac vice motions, or pay pro hac vice fees, for any outside counsel who have previously appeared and been admitted pro hac vice in Civil Action No. 1:18cv193. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/7/2019. (dk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 174 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Status Conference held on 11/7/2019. (Court Reporter Stacy Harlow) (dk)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Civil Action No. 1:18-cv-193 will serve as the lead case where all filings should be docketed. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/7/19. (mh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 172 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by AstraZeneca AB, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE for 11/7/2019 09:00 AM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. The Court DIRECTS lead counsel for Mylan to arrange the conference call and provide dial-in information to all parties and the Court, by email to candace_levitsky@wvnd.uscourts.gov, no later than Wednesday, November 6, 2019. The Court further DIRECTS the parties to file a joint status report by Wednesday, November 6, 2019, indicating whether the parties will agree to consolidate these cases for all purposes. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/5/2019. (dk)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled civil action be transferred to and placed on the docket of the Honorable Irene M. Keeley, United States District Judge. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 11/5/2019. (dk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 169 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Attorneys Kelly, Han, Silver, Behrens, Stole, Rubman, White, Anstaett, Grebb, Chajon, and Bloodworth. (dk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon H. Copland on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Copland, Gordon)
November 4, 2019 Filing 167 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:18-cv-01562. (dk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 166 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s and 3M Company's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) and (2) Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s and 3M Company's First Supplemental Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Specific Interrogatories to Mylan Defendant Group (Nos. 1-6) filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s and 3M Company's First Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 163 REDACTED VERSION of #146 Letter by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 162 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP re #145 MOTION to Compel , #146 Letter (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 161 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding transfer of case and further redactions - re #152 Letter. (Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE OF SERVICE of a subpoena duces tecum directed to Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP and a subpoena ad testificandum directed to Gregory T. Lowen filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., 3M COMPANY, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., AND CATALENT PHARMA SOLUTIONS LLCS FIRST NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF ASTRAZENECA AB AND ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant 3M Company's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by 3M Company.(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Transfer Case; finding as moot #32 Motion to Dismiss ; denying #19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/18/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 156 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/18/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 155 REDACTED VERSION of #117 Notice (Other) by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 154 REDACTED VERSION of #116 Notice (Other) by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 153 REDACTED VERSION of #114 Notice to Take Deposition by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 17, 2019 The Discovery Conference originally set for today, 10/17/2019, at 3:00 p.m. is cancelled per counsel as it is no longer needed. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 152 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Further redactions to D.I. 41 - re #41 Declaration. (Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 151 REDACTED VERSION of #39 Answering Brief in Opposition, by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Invalidity Contentions filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Filing 149 REDACTED VERSION of #147 Letter, to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Response to Plaintiffs' letter of October 14, 2019 regarding discovery disputes by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 148 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Noninfringement Contentions filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 147 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Response to Plaintiffs' letter of October 14, 2019 regarding discovery disputes - re #145 MOTION to Compel , #146 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (144 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 98 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan P. Keane filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/15/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 14, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI # 41 was placed back under seal by the Intake Supervisor pursuant to e-mail received from Counsel per Mylan. (rwc) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 146 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Discovery Dispute - re #145 MOTION to Compel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 14, 2019 Filing 145 MOTION to Compel - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Averment of Counsel)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Court has reviewed the redacted version of D.I. #41 , docketed as D.I. #55 . The Court finds that good cause does not exist to redact many of the proposed redactions. The Court will nonetheless allow the parties to propose more limited redactions of D.I. #41 and will entertain argument that good cause exists to make such redactions if supported by sworn declaration(s) from a person and/or persons employed by the party that seeks the redaction(s) in question. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/11/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Court has reviewed the redacted version of D.I. #39 , docketed as D.I. #53 . The Court finds that good cause does not exist to redact the proposed redactions except for the percentage figures recited on pages 9 and 12. Wherefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that AstraZeneca shall file by no later than October 16, 2019 a redacted version of D.I. #39 consistent with this Order. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/11/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Court has reviewed the redacted versions of filings D.I. 20, 21, 40, and 49, docketed respectively as D.I. 25, 26, 54, and 56. The Court finds that good cause does not exist to redact any of the proposed redactions and therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that D.I. #20 , #21 , #40 and #49 are UNSEALED. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/11/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 144 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Megan P. Keane - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Megan P. Keane)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Oral Argument held on 10/10/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 143 Joint NOTICE of Service of Case Compendium In Support of Joint Claim Construction Brief by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP re (141 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (95 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief (Joyce, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 142 Joint APPENDIX re (141 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief, (95 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC) Claim Construction Opening Brief by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J1, #2 Exhibits P1 - P11DD, #3 Exhibits D1 - D4)(Joyce, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 141 Joint CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Joyce, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (94 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC, 140 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the deadline for the Parties to submit their Joint Claim Construction Brief to Wednesday, October 9, 2019 (from Tuesday, October 8, 2019) filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/9/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 140 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME the deadline for the Parties to submit their Joint Claim Construction Brief to Wednesday, October 9, 2019 (from Tuesday, October 8, 2019) - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Joyce, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Wayne Talton on October 24, 2019 filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Stephen Stein on October 31, 2019 filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rupi Pannu on October 21, 2019 filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Martin Wilson on October 23, 2019 filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kim Kriesel on October 22, 2019 filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jack Rasmussen on October 25, 2019 filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Annette Purrington on October 29, 2019 filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE OF SERVICE of a subpoena duces tecum on Fish & Richardson PC and a subpoena ad testificandum on Janis K. Fraser filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Keller, Karen) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Sur-Reply Markman Brief filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 130 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Frank Trudo on October 16, 2019 filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jonas Sibomana on October 17, 2019 filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gary Rowles on October 18, 2019 filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jorgen Rasmussen on October 30, 2019 filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Maria Marlow on November 1, 2019 filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Andy Ludzik on October 21, 2019 filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Darren Hodson on October 24, 2019 filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nayna Govind on October 28, 2019 filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Domenick Fanelli on October 15. 2019 filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 121 Letter to Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding Supplemental Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 4, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, the PDF file at D.I. No. 114 has been removed and replaced with a version that appropriately reflects the entry is sealed. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., 3M Company, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC's Third Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 12-18) filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-3) and Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 123-129) filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., 3M Company, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Catalent Pharma Solutions LLCs First Notice of Deposition of AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 117 [SEALED] First NOTICE of Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) [Supplemental] by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 116 [SEALED] First NOTICE of Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) [Supplemental] by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendants' Second Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (No. 11) filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 28, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 114 was placed under seal by Clerk's Office. DI 115 NOTICE to Take Deposition was deleted by mistake and should be re-filed under seal by Counsel.(rwc) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 114 (SEALED) NOTICE to Take Deposition of 3M Company filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 9/28/2019 (rwc). (Main Document 114 replaced on 10/4/2019) (fms). [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Reply Markman Brief and (2) Reply Declaration of Cory J. Berkland, Ph.D. on Claim Construction filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER, Whereas Plaintiffs have requested oral argument on Mylan's motion to dismiss for improper venue and 3M's motion to dismiss or transfer venue (D.I. #52 ); and Whereas the Court was previously inclined to transfer the case but, upon further consideration of the relevant case law and statutes, has doubts as to the correctness of that inclination; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Court will entertain oral argument on the pending motions on 10/10/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/20/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER Setting Hearings: An Oral Argument is set for 10/10/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/20/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brandon M. White for 3M Company and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Einar Stole for AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Boyd on September 19, 2019 filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dr. Anthony J. Cutie on September 18, 2019 filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (110 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 68 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Einar Stole filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/17/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 110 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Einar Stole - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Einar Stole)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Chajon on behalf of 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Chajon, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #108 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brandon M. White filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/16/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 108 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brandon M. White - filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (65 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC, 106 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (1) Service of Defendants Answering Claim Construction Brief is hereby extended to Monday, September 9, 2019 (from Friday, September 6); (2) Service of Plaintiffs Reply Claim Construction Brief is hereby extended to Monday, September 23 (from Tuesday, September 17); (3) Service of Defendants Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief is hereby extended to Thursday, October 3 (from Friday, September 27); and (4) the deadline to file the Joint Claim Construction Brief is hereby extended to Tuesday, October 8 (from Wednesday, October 2). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1)Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., 3M Company, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Catalent Pharma Solutions LLCs Answering Claim Construction Brief; (2) Declaration of Dr. Anthony J. Cutie in Support of Defendants Answering Claim Construction Brief; and (3) Declaration of Robert Boyd in Support of Defendants Answering Claim Construction Brief filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 106 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (1) Service of Defendants Answering Claim Construction Brief is hereby extended to Monday, September 9, 2019 (from Friday, September 6); (2) Service of Plaintiffs Reply Claim Construction Brief is hereby extended to Monday, September 23 (from Tuesday, September 17); (3) Service of Defendants Sur-Reply Claim Construction Brief is hereby extended to Thursday, October 3 (from Friday, September 27); and (4) the deadline to file the Joint Claim Construction Brief is hereby extended to Tuesday, October 8 (from Wednesday, October 2) to - filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Set Hearings: A Discovery Conference is set per request of counsel for 10/17/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #105 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Joinder of Other Parties and Amendment of Pleadings to September 6, 2019 filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Setting Scheduling Order Deadlines ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2019., Joinder of Parties due by 9/6/2019.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 9/3/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 105 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Joinder of Other Parties and Amendment of Pleadings to September 6, 2019 - filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (104 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 64 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for substantial completion of document production to September 6, 2019 filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/27/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 104 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for substantial completion of document production to September 6, 2019 - filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs Opening Markman Brief; and (2) Declaration of Cory J. Berkland, Ph.D. on Claim Construction filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 4/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/14/19. (cak) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 101 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Frederick L. Cottrell, III regarding effect, if any, of merger between Mylan and Upjohn - re #94 Order,,,. (Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 100 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Responsive Letter - re #94 Order,,,. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Remark re: Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Default Word Limits for Markman Briefs - Per Judge Connolly's standing order of June 18, 2019 on His Honor's website: "The provisions regarding briefing, case dispositive motions, papers filed under seal, hard copies, motions in limine, and word limitations set forth in the April 22, 2019 revised form order for patent cases shall apply in IN ALL PATENT CASES in which the parties are represented by counsel, regardless of when the case was filed, and specifically including: (1) cases in which the Court has already entered a Scheduling Order; and (2) cases in which a Scheduling Order has not yet been entered and a party seeks to file a motion to dismiss, motion for a preliminary injunction, or other filing before the entry of a Scheduling Order." Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (56 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC, 95 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to: (1) submit the Joint Claim Construction Chart and (2) submit their position regarding word limits for Claim Construction briefing to Monday, August 5, 2019 (from Friday, August 2, 2019) filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/7/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION for Claim Construction re (58 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC, 97 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC) Claim Construction Chart - filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION for Claim Construction re (58 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC, 97 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC) Claim Construction Chart - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 97 CLAIM Construction Chart by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 96 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Default Word Limits for Markman Briefs - re (66 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC) Scheduling Order,,. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 95 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to: (1) submit the Joint Claim Construction Chart and (2) submit their position regarding word limits for Claim Construction briefing to Monday, August 5, 2019 (from Friday, August 2, 2019) - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #93 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit the Joint Claim Construction Chart to August 2, 2019 filed by 3M Company, Mylan Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/2/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER, On or before August 13, 2019, the parties shall each file a three-page letter (in 14-point, Times New Roman font) informing the Court what effect, if any, the announced merger has on Mylan's pending motion as well as on this litigation, including but not limited to Mylan's status as a West Virginia corporation and its status as the holder of the relevant AND As in this case. Additionally, given the Court's present inclination to transfer the case against Mylan to the Northern District of West Virginia as well as its understanding that Defendant 3M Company consents to transfer to the Northern District, see D.I. 33 at 3, Plaintiffs AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, in their letter, shall inform the Court whether they consent to the transfer of the claims against 3M Company to the Northern District. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/2/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 93 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit the Joint Claim Construction Chart to August 2, 2019 - filed by 3M Company, Mylan Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and 3M Company's list of term(s)/phrase(s) in issue and list of the rebuttal evidence on which Defendants intend to rely filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFFS IDENTIFICATION OF INTRINSIC EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS PROPOSED CONSTRUCTIONS filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and 3M Company's proposed constructions and identification of intrinsic evidentiary support filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s First Amended Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Mylan (Nos. 1-62) and (2) Defendant 3M Company's First Amended Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to 3M (Nos. 1-60) filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Preliminary Constructions and Identification of Intrinsic Evidentiary Support filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Objections and Responses to Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-10) filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and 3M Company's proposed terms for construction filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs List of Proposed Claim Terms for Construction filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
July 16, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and 3M Company's Invalidity Contentions and the Document Production Accompanying Invalidity Contentions filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE OF SERVICE of PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS (NOS. l122) filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 8/5/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/26/19. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(cak) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 81 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-10) filed by Catalent Pharma Solutions, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc..(Hoeschen, Nathan) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Common Interrogatories to Plaintiffs (Nos. 1-10) filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/19/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 78 PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (77 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 40 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to Submit Proposed Protective Order to June 17, 2019 filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/17/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 77 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to Submit Proposed Protective Order to June 17, 2019 - filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s and 3M Company's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Specific Interrogatories to Mylan Defendant Group (Nos. 1-6) filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 75 REDACTED VERSION of #67 Stipulation by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 74 REDACTED VERSION of #71 Amended Complaint, by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (37 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC, 73 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to Submit Proposed Protective Order to Friday, June 14, 2019 (from Monday June 10, 2019) filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 73 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Parties to Submit Proposed Protective Order to Friday, June 14, 2019 (from Monday June 10, 2019) - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions Against Defendants filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 71 [SEALED] Second AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.- filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
June 4, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The SEALED Second Amended Complaint filed at D.I. 70 has been removed from the docket as the pdf attached to the sealed entry was the second amended complaint for CA 18-1685-CFC. Counsel should file the correct Second Amended Complaint. The patent report (formerly D.I. 71) has been re-numbered to appear on the docket as D.I. 70. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 70 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,759,328 ;8,143,239 ;8,575,137 ;7,967,011 ;10,166,247 . (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 6/4/2019 (fms). [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-122) filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Rawnsley, Jason) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
May 31, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PATENT REPORT: Counsel should file the Second Amended Complaint electronically with the court as the attachment to the stipulation appears to be missing exhibits. Also, please note that if patents are being added to this case through the SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT referenced in D.I. #67 and #68 , the filing party should complete the Report to Commissioner of Patents & Trademarks, and enter it on the docket using the PATENT/TRADEMARK REPORT event in the OTHER DOCUMENT list. The patent report form can be found at www.ded.uscourts.gov under the Clerk's Office FORMS button. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 [SEALED] SO ORDERED, re #67 Stipulation filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/31/2019.This order has been emailed to local counsel. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 67 [SEALED] STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Second Amended Complaint by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
May 21, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(cak) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Fact Discovery completed by 11/1/2019. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 10/2/2019. A Markman Hearing is set for 12/4/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/2/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Bench Trial is set for 6/15/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/20/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s and 3M Company's Discovery Disclosures and Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s and 3M Company's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LPs Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1); (2) Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures Identifying Defendants Accused Products and Plaintiffs Asserted Patents; and (3) Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of The Default Standard for Discovery filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 63 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs First Set of Specific Interrogatories to Mylan Defendant Group (Nos. 1-6) filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to Mylan (Nos. 1-62) and Defendant 3M Company's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to 3M (Nos. 1-60) filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Common Interrogatories (Nos. 1-6) filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Scheduling Conference held on 4/15/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Counsel to submit the final proposed scheduling order to the Court. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 59 PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Mylan (Nos. 1-62), (2) Plaintiffs First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to 3M (Nos. 1-60) filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 57 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Daniel M. Silver, Esq.. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 56 REDACTED VERSION of #49 Reply Brief, by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 55 REDACTED VERSION of #41 Declaration by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 54 REDACTED VERSION of #40 Declaration by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 53 REDACTED VERSION of #39 Answering Brief in Opposition, by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 52 REQUEST for Oral Argument by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue, #32 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of West Virginia MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party . (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #51 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Plaintiffs to Submit Redacted Versions of (1) Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to the Mylan Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue and 3M's Motion to Dismiss o filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/22/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 51 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Plaintiffs to Submit Redacted Versions of (1) Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to the Mylan Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue and 3M's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue, (2) Declaration of Domenick Fanelli; and (3) Declaration of Anna Q. Han to Thursday, March 28, 2019 (from Thursday, March 21, 2019) - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #48 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David L. Anstaett filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/20/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 50 DECLARATION re #49 Reply Brief, (Declaration of Emily J. Greb) by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY BRIEF re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue, #32 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of West Virginia MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party filed by 3M Company, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 10/11/2019 (nmf). [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David L. Anstaett - filed by 3M Company. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gary M. Rubman for AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #47 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Plaintiffs to Submit Redacted Versions of (1) Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to the Mylan Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue and 3M's Motion to Dismiss o filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/18/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 47 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the Plaintiffs to Submit Redacted Versions of (1) Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to the Mylan Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue and 3M's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue, (2) Declaration of Domenick Fanelli; and (3) Declaration of Anna Q. Han to Thursday, March 21, 2019 (from Thursday, March 14, 2019) - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SO ORDERED, re #45 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Mylan N.V., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Inc., Party Mylan N.V., Mylan Inc. and Mylan Laboratories Limited terminated. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/13/2019. (fms) Modified on 3/14/2019 (fms). [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 45 STIPULATION of Dismissal Regarding Dismissal of Certain Defendants by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V.. (Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order Setting Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 4/15/2019 at 03:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/8/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #43 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file redactions to DI. 39, 40 and 41 to March 14, 2019 filed by 3M Company, Mylan N.V., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/8/2019. (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 43 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file redactions to DI. 39, 40 and 41 to March 14, 2019 - filed by 3M Company, Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Filing 42 Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Proposed Scheduling Order - re (37 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 37 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 19 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC, 19 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC) Order,, Set Deadlines,. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
March 5, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Douglas A. Behrens for AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(ddp) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 41 [SEALED] DECLARATION re #39 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Anna Q. Han by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Y, #2 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 40 DECLARATION re #39 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Domenick Fanelli by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 10/11/2019 (nmf). [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 39 [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue, #32 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of West Virginia MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (38 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 20 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Douglas A. Behrens filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/22/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Douglas A. Behrens - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Douglas A. Behrens)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER, IT IS ORDERED that, on or before March 5, 2019, counsel for plaintiffs shall inform the court as to whether the need for coordinated discovery and/or Markman proceedings is anticipated as to the above cases and, if so, when a joint scheduling conference might most efficiently be conducted. ORDER, Setting Deadlines: ( Notice of Compliance deadline set for 3/5/2019.) Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/19/2019. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SO ORDERED, re #35 Stipulation filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Set Briefing Schedule: re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue, #32 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of West Virginia MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party . (Answering Brief due 2/28/2019., Reply Brief due 3/19/2019.). See Stipulation for further details. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/4/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing on Motions to Dismiss re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue, #32 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of West Virginia MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Joyce, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by 3M Company. (Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 33 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #32 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of West Virginia MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party filed by 3M Company.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/7/2019. (Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of West Virginia, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Party - filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shannon M. Bloodworth and Emily J. Greb filed by 3M Company. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/23/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Emily J. Greb for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shannon M. Bloodworth and Emily J. Greb - filed by 3M Company. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiffs' Deadline to Submit an Answering Brief to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue to Thursday, February 21, 2019 filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Set Briefing Schedule: re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue. (Answering Brief due 2/21/2019.). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/18/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiffs' Deadline to Submit an Answering Brief to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue to Thursday, February 21, 2019 - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason James Rawnsley on behalf of 3M Company (Rawnsley, Jason) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Cottrell, III on behalf of 3M Company (Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Ewing on behalf of 3M Company (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 26 REDACTED VERSION of #21 Declaration, by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 25 REDACTED VERSION of #20 Opening Brief in Support, by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Alexandra M. Ewing (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David L. Anstaett and Shannon M. Bloodworth for Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shannon M. Bloodworth, David L. Anstaett and Emily J. Greb filed by Mylan N.V., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/8/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shannon M. Bloodworth, David L. Anstaett and Emily J. Greb - filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Mylan N.V. for Mylan Inc.; Corporate Parent Mylan Inc. for Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue, #20 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of Keith Meckstroth) by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3)(Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 10/11/2019 (nmf). [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 20 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/22/2019. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 10/11/2019 (nmf). [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Improper Venue - filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 18 REDACTED VERSION of #13 Amended Complaint, by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. 3M Company served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to 3M Company. (sar) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint to January 7, 2019 filed by Mylan N.V., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Mylan Inc. answer due 1/7/2019; Mylan Laboratories Limited answer due 1/7/2019; Mylan N.V. answer due 1/7/2019; Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 1/7/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/2/2019. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
December 31, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint to January 7, 2019 - filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Regarding Extension of Time to File Redactions to the First Amended Complaint to January 4, 2019 filed by 3M Company, Mylan N.V., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/27/2018. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Regarding Extension of Time to File Redactions to the First Amended Complaint to January 4, 2019 - filed by 3M Company, Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. 3M Company served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to 3M Company on 12/20/2018. (nmg) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 13 [SEALED] First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., 3M Company- filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Certificate of Service)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Cottrell, III on behalf of Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Cottrell, Frederick) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
November 27, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anna Q. Han for AstraZeneca AB and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (8 in 1:18-cv-01685-CFC, 11 in 1:18-cv-01562-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher N. Sipes, Gary M. Rubman, Matthew Kudzin and Anna Q. Han filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/16/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01562-CFC, 1:18-cv-01685-CFC(fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christopher N. Sipes, Gary M. Rubman, Matthew Kudzin and Anna Q. Han - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Certification for Christopher N. Sipes, Gary M. Rubman, Matthew Kudzin and Anna Q. Han)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to December 20, 2018. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Mylan Inc. answer due 12/20/2018; Mylan Laboratories Limited answer due 12/20/2018; Mylan N.V. answer due 12/20/2018; Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 12/20/2018. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/15/2018. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to December 20, 2018 - filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to November 14, 2018 filed by Mylan N.V., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Mylan Inc. answer due 11/14/2018; Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. answer due 11/14/2018. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/2/2018. (fms) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to November 14, 2018 - filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Ewing, Alexandra) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Mylan Inc. made on October 11, 2018 by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. made on October 17, 2018 by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Silver, Daniel) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 17, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Mylan Inc. on 10/11/2018; Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 10/11/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca AB filed by AstraZeneca AB. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,759,328; 8,143,239; 8,575,137; 7,967,011. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 8/30/2018. Date of Expiration of Patent: see attached.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 3/1/2021. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2479128.) - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg) [Transferred from Delaware on 11/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AstraZeneca AB et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Einar Stole
Represented By: Gary M. Rubman
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Anna Q. Han
Represented By: Douglas A. Behrens
Represented By: Michael P Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca AB
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Einar Stole
Represented By: Gary M. Rubman
Represented By: Alexandra M. Joyce
Represented By: Anna Q. Han
Represented By: Douglas A. Behrens
Represented By: Michael P Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mylan inc.
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: David L. Anstaett
Represented By: Shannon M Bloodworth
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: David L. Anstaett
Represented By: Shannon M Bloodworth
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories Limited
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: David L. Anstaett
Represented By: Shannon M Bloodworth
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Chajon
Represented By: Brandon M. White
Represented By: Emily J. Greb
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: David L. Anstaett
Represented By: Shannon M Bloodworth
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: John D. Pizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Michael A. Chajon
Represented By: Brandon M. White
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Alexandra M. Ewing
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Emily J. Greb
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: David L. Anstaett
Represented By: Shannon M Bloodworth
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: John D. Pizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?