Luczak v. Dunbar et al
Plaintiff: Casey Luczak
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons, US Probation Office, Ms. B. Dugan, Mr. A. Baughman, Ms. R. Thompson, Ms. L. Smith, Mr. B. Friend, Dr. Gregory Mims, Mr. A. Mori, Mr. Joe Coakley, Ms. Angela P. Dunbar and Ms. Leanne M. Vondehaar
Case Number: 1:2019cv00210
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Notice; #7 Order on Public Motion. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/11/2020. (dk)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Casey Luczak to #6 Notice of Deficient Pleadings. (Attachments: #1 Returned blank forms, #2 Envelope)(mh)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/21/2019 per USPS website. (dk) Modified on 11/26/2019 to correct link. (dk)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS #3 MOTION TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMITS AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLY WITH THE LOCAL RULES OF PRISONER LITIGATION PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 11/19/19. (Copy PS Plaintiff via cert. mail)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 First pages of Bivens, FTCA and IFP Forms)(mh) (To PS Plaintiff via cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/19/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/19/2019 with corrected return receipt) (mh).
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (Copy PS Plaintiff via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Images deleted - filed in wrong case. Modified on 11/19/2019 (mh).
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION For Leave to Exceed the Page Limit Pursuant to Relevant Evidence Under Rules of Evidence 401 and 402 by Casey Luczak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Casey Luczak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 FEDERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT (Bivens Action) against all Defendants, filed by Casey Luczak. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Misc. Correspondence (Sealed per Chambers), #2 Exhibit A - Misc. Document, #3 Exhibit B - Misc. Correspondence (Sealed per Chambers), #4 Exhibit C - Medical Records (Sealed per Chambers), #5 Exhibit D - Zaid Declaration, #6 Attachment 2 - Claim Form (Sealed per Chambers), #7 Exhibit A - Misc. Document, #8 Attachment 3 - Claim Form (Sealed per Chambers), #9 Attachment 4 - Misc. Document, #10 Attachment 5 - Misc. Document, #11 Exhibit A - Misc. Document, #12 Attachment 6 - Misc. Document, #13 Attachment 7 - Misc. Document, #14 Envelope)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luczak v. Dunbar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Probation Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. B. Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. A. Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. R. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. B. Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gregory Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. A. Mori
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Joe Coakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Angela P. Dunbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Leanne M. Vondehaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Luczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?