Almirall, LLC v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Plaintiff: Almirall, LLC
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00006
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Applications (ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 32 Plaintiff's Answer to Counterclaims of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Other Document re #26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Almirall, LLC. (Companion, James)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alissa M. Pacchioli for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/6/2020. (wrr)
February 6, 2020 Filing 30 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee as tp Alissa M. Pacchioli: PAID $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002856. (wrr)
February 5, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Alissa M. Pacchioli) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER (The Scheduling Conference, previously scheduled for 4/10/2020, is RESCHEDULED to 4/13/2020, 02:30 PM, before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. All other deadlines established in the First Order remain in effect.) Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/4/2020. (cml)
February 3, 2020 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc., Corporate Parent Mylan N.V. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc... (O'Brien, William)
February 3, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Almirall, LLC by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(O'Brien, William)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Deepro R. Mukerjee for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/30/2020. (wrr)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Lance A Soderstrom for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/30/2020. (wrr)
January 30, 2020 Filing 23 PHV Filing fee as to Lance A. Soderstrom and Deepro R. Mukerjee: PAID $400.00, receipt number WVNC002849 (wrr)
January 29, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Lance A. Soderstrom) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
January 29, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Deepro R. Mukerjee) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
January 21, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 1/13/2020. (wrr)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney James S. Trainor. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/16/2020. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Richard J. Shea. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/16/2020. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hav Vice for Attorney Elizabeth B. Hagan. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/16/2020. (copy counsel of record)(jmm) ( Main Document 17 replaced on 1/29/2020 to correct signature date on document NEF regenerated) (jmm).
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attoren Rebecca A.E. Fewkes. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/16/2020. (copy counsel of record)(jmm)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 800.00, receipt number WVNC002836 for Attorneys Fewkes, Shea, Hagan and Trainor. (jmm)
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James S. Trainor by Almirall, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth B. Hagan by Almirall, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
January 16, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard J. Shea by Almirall, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rebecca A.E. Fewkes by Almirall, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 3/13/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/27/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2020 01:30 PM from judge's chambers via telephone, unless otherwise determined, before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 4/17/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 1/13/2020. (wrr) Modified on 1/15/2020 to correct location of scheduling conference (wrr). NEF regenerated.
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 1/13/2020. (wrr)
January 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William J O'Brien on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (O'Brien, William)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Attorneys Trainor, Shea, Hagan and Fewkes. (wrr)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Almirall, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Almirall S.A. for Almirall, LLC.. (wrr) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated.
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (wrr) (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/10/2020 with correct doucment) (wrr). NEF regenerated. Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated. (Main Document 4 replaced on 1/10/2020 with correct document) (wrr). NEF regenerated.
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 Supplemental Information for Patent Cases Involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) filed by Almirall, LLC. (wrr) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated.
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002360. (wrr) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated.
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Almirall, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Patent Information, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wrr) Modified on 1/10/2020 to correct filing date (wrr). NEF regenerated.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almirall, LLC v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Lance A Soderstrom
Represented By: Alissa M. Pacchioli
Represented By: Deepro R. Mukerjee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Almirall, LLC
Represented By: R.J. Shea
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: James S. Trainor, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca A.E. Fewkes
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Hagan, Ph.D.
Represented By: Richard J. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?