Murphy v. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Murphy
Defendant: Nate Birkmeir and Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00011
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 15 Initial Partial Filing fee: PAID $ 39.87, receipt number WVNC002881. (wrr)
March 2, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #13 ORDER GRANTING #8 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/27/2020. (wrr)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #8 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 2/25/2020. (Copy to PS plaintiff via CM, RRR. Order and Consent to Collection via USPS to Trustee Clerk, FCI Gilmer and emailed to financial deputy.) (wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Michael Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wrr)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Envelope)(wrr)
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 ORDER TO CORRECT DEFICIENCIES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/14/2020. (wrr)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO CORRECT DEFICIENCIES. Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order, together with a PTAR and Consent to Collect to the pro se Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 2/11/2020 (copy with forms enclosed to pro se Plaintiff via certified mail). (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2020: #1 Consent To Collection of Fee and PTAR forms, #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
February 10, 2020 Filing 8 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, #2 Inmate Earning Statement, #3 Envelope)(wrr)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Letter to plaintiff regarding payment of filing fee, #5 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/21/2020. (wrr)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Michael Murphy regarding payment of filing fee. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form)(Mailed to PS plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/15/2020 with corrected document) (wrr). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (Copy to PS plaintiff via CM, RRR.)(wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00031. (wrr)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE It is directed that this matter be transferred for additional proceedings to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 1/15/2020. (cc: plaintiff) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/15/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Proposed Findings & Recommendations. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/15/2020.]
January 13, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/15/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/15/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Birkmeir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?