The Harrison County Coal Company v. United Mine Workers of America International Union et al
Plaintiff: The Harrison County Coal Company
Defendant: United Mine Workers of America International Union and United Mine Workers of America District 31
Case Number: 1:2020cv00013
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory E. Ridenour on behalf of The Harrison County Coal Company (Ridenour, Cory)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against The Harrison County Coal Company by United Mine Workers of America District 31, United Mine Workers of America International Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Fagan, Kevin)
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 Notice Of Disclosure Statement Hearing for April 14, 2020 at 10:00am. (jmm)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 4/10/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2020. Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2020, 1:00 PM, in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/24/2020. (dk)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Harrison County Coal Company. United Mine Workers of America District 31 waiver sent on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Glass, Michael)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Harrison County Coal Company. United Mine Workers of America International Union waiver sent on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Glass, Michael)
January 24, 2020 Filing 7 Notice Of Deadline Requiring Submission Of Proof Of Claim On or Before March 9, 2020. (jmm)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by The Harrison County Coal Company re #1 Complaint, of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons directed to UMWA, District 31 (Glass, Michael)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by The Harrison County Coal Company re #1 Complaint, of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons directed to UMWA, International Union (Glass, Michael)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Harrison County Coal Company. (Glass, Michael)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Mine Workers of America District 31, United Mine Workers of America International Union, filed by The Harrison County Coal Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2971110(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Harrison County Coal Company v. United Mine Workers of America International Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Mine Workers of America International Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Mine Workers of America District 31
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Harrison County Coal Company
Represented By: Michael D. Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?