Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Inc. and Mylan Laboratories Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv00019
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Withdraw of Atty. Leora Ben-Ami as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 4/2/20. (jss)
April 2, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw of Atty. Leora Ben-Ami as counsel for Plaintiffs by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
March 4, 2020 Filing 30 Pro Hac Vice Filing fees for D. Mukerjee, L. Soderstrom and J. Janusz: $ 600.00, receipt number WVNC002874 (jss)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Lance A. Soderstrom's #24 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 3/4/20. (jss)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Deepro R. Mukerjee's #25 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 3/4/20. (jss)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Joseph M. Janusz's #26 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 3/4/20. (jss)
March 3, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Joseph M. Janusz) by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
March 3, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Deepro R. Mukerjee) by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
March 3, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Lance A. Soderstrom) by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
February 28, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION REGARDING RESPONSIVE PLEADING DEADLINE (APRIL 12, 2020) by Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (O'Brien, William)
February 28, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mylan Laboratories Limited. Mylan Laboratories Limited waiver sent on 2/12/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (O'Brien, William)
February 14, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mylan Inc. service accepted by SOS on 2/6/2020. (jss)
February 14, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. service accepted by SOS on 2/6/2020. (jss)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Jeanna Wacker's #13 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/13/20. (jss)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Mira Mulvaney's #12 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/13/20. (jss)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Leona Ben-Ami's #11 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/13/20. (jss)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' #14 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorneys Sam Kwon, Ashley Ross, Christopher J. Citro and Thomas F. Fleming terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/13/2020. (cnd)
February 13, 2020 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice fees for Leora Ben-Ami, Mira Mulvaney, and Jeanna Wacker: $ 600.00, receipt number WVNC002861. (cnd)
February 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Attorneys Thomas F. Fleming, Sam Kwon, Ashley Ross and Christopher J. Citro by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jeanna Wacker by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mira Mulvaney by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Leora Ben-Ami by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Companion, James)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 3/30/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/13/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/2020 at 01:00 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 5/4/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 2/12/20. (jss)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William J O'Brien on behalf of Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (O'Brien, William)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to L. Ben-Ami, T. Fleming, J. Wacker, M. Mulvaney, S. Kwon, A. Ross and C. Citro. (jss)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW002384 (jss)
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (jss)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jss)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 Supplemental Information for Patent Cases Involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (jss)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan Inc., Mylan Laboratories Limited, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Patent Appplication Publication, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
Represented By: Ashley Ross
Represented By: Sam Kwon
Represented By: Christopher J. Citro
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Leora Ben-Ami
Represented By: Thomas F. Fleming
Represented By: Jeanna M. Wacker
Represented By: Mira Mulvaney
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH
Represented By: Ashley Ross
Represented By: Sam Kwon
Represented By: Christopher J. Citro
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Leora Ben-Ami
Represented By: Thomas F. Fleming
Represented By: Jeanna M. Wacker
Represented By: Mira Mulvaney
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By: Ashley Ross
Represented By: Sam Kwon
Represented By: Christopher J. Citro
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Leora Ben-Ami
Represented By: Thomas F. Fleming
Represented By: Jeanna M. Wacker
Represented By: Mira Mulvaney
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Ross
Represented By: Sam Kwon
Represented By: Christopher J. Citro
Represented By: James F. Companion
Represented By: Leora Ben-Ami
Represented By: Thomas F. Fleming
Represented By: Jeanna M. Wacker
Represented By: Mira Mulvaney
Represented By: Sandra K. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Lance A Soderstrom
Represented By: Deepro R. Mukerjee
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Joseph M. Janusz
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Represented By: Lance A Soderstrom
Represented By: Deepro R. Mukerjee
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Joseph M. Janusz
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories Limited
Represented By: Lance A Soderstrom
Represented By: Deepro R. Mukerjee
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Joseph M. Janusz
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?