Quinones-Cedeno v. Healey et al
Plaintiff: Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno
Defendant: R. Reckard, J. Handlin, W. Healey and T. Thorne
Case Number: 1:2020cv00048
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #13 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/7/2020. (wrr)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S #2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 5/5/2020. (Copy to PS plaintiff via CM, RRR. Copy mailed to Trustee Clerk and emailed to Financial Deputy, each with a copy of #4 Consent to Collection of Fees.) (wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 Declaration filed by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(wrr)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER from Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno to Clerk of Court requesting docket sheet. (Public docket sheet sent to plaintiff.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wrr)
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice of Deficient Pleading, #6 Notice of General Guidelines. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/23/2020, per USPS. (wrr)
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 Objection To Order Dismissing Case filed by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION filed by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmm)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court.(wrr)(Copy to PS plaintiff via CM, RRR.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (wrr)(Copy to PS plaintiff via CM, RRR.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/18/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (wrr).
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wrr)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wrr)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(wrr)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope B, #3 Envelope)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinones-Cedeno v. Healey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Reckard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Handlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazaro Quinones-Cedeno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?