Dixon v. Meade
Plaintiff: Cameron Dixon
Defendant: Brian Meade
Case Number: 1:2020cv00049
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause within fourteen (14) days of the receipt of this Order as to why this matter should not be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to prosecute. (copy psp cmrr) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 5/13/20. (jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jss).
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 4/16/20. (jss)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO CORRECT DEFICIENCIES. (copy pspl) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 4/10/20. (Attachments: #1 PTAR, #2 Consent)(jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/14/2020: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jss).
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cameron Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Inquiry, #2 Envelope)(jss)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/23/20. (jss)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Letter. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/20/20. (jss)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to Cameron Dixon. (Attachments: #1 IFP, #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Meade filed by Cameron Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Green Form, #2 Exhibit B - Credit Reports, #3 Envelope)(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?