Dixon v. Thorpe
Plaintiff: Cameron Dixon
Defendant: James Thorpe
Case Number: 1:2020cv00050
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 5/13/20. (mh) (To PS Plaintiff via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on (Per USPS 4/15/20). (mh)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO CORRECT DEFICIENCIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 4/10/2020. (To PS Plaintiff by cert. mail) (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2020: #1 PTAR, #2 Consent to Collection) (dk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2020: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cameron Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice and #3 Letter. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/23/20. (mh)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Cameron Dixon re: filing fees. (Attachments: #1 First page of form)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (To PS Plaintiff via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Thorpe, filed by Cameron Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipts, #2 Envelope)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #3 Exhibit B - Credit Reports (Sealed per Chambers)) (mh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thorpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?