Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Organon USA Inc. and Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V.
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Inc. and Mylan API US LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00061
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Applications (ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 7/6/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/20/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 8/3/2020 01:30 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. The scheduling conference SHALL BE by telephone unless otherwise determined. Discovery due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 5/21/2020. (wrr)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah A. Geers. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 5/19/2020. (wrr)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Doug Winnard. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 5/19/2020. (wrr) Modified on 5/19/2020 to correct docket text (wrr). NEF regenerated.
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 5/19/2020. (wrr)
May 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William J O'Brien on behalf of Mylan API US LLC, Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (O'Brien, William)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee as to Doug Winnard and Sarah Geers: PAID $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002913. (wrr)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro hac vice Doug Winnard by Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V., Organon USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Fenwick, Carrie)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 Motion/Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Sarah Geers filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V., Organon USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Fenwick, Carrie) Modified on 5/5/2020 to make a motion. (wrr).
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 Motion/Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Doug Winnard filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V., Organon USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Fenwick, Carrie) Modified on 5/5/2020 to make a motion (wrr).
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Organon USA Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V.. All Defendants. (Fenwick, Carrie)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 Other Document re #1 Complaint Exhibits A, B and C filed by Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V., Organon USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Fenwick, Carrie)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (mh)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V., Organon USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc. for Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V., Organon USA Inc... (Fenwick, Carrie) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/2/2020 with flattened document) (wrr).
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 PAPERLESS NOTICE : Case filing began in CM/ECF shell case, with filing fee being paid through pay.gov (Receipt #0424-3019337) on April 1, 2020. However, filer failed to complete filing process following receipt of payment. Clerk's Office notified filer of incomplete filing and the Complaint was received on April 2, 2020 in the shell case. (mh)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan API US LLC, Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Organon USA Inc., Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V.Filing Fee $400 Receipt No. 0424-3019337 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V. et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan API US LLC
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organon USA Inc.
Represented By: Shanna Lee Brown
Represented By: Carrie Goodwin Fenwick
Represented By: Sarah A. Geers
Represented By: Doug Winnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merck Sharp & Dohme B.V.
Represented By: Shanna Lee Brown
Represented By: Carrie Goodwin Fenwick
Represented By: Sarah A. Geers
Represented By: Doug Winnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?