LEGRAND et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Plaintiff: Martell A. LeGrand
Defendant: Department of Corrections, HAZELTON USP PRIVATE OWN and Federal Bureau of Prisons
Petitioner: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00115
Filed: June 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01783. (jmm)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THE MOTION TO TRANSFER IS GRANTED AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THIS CASE, PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406(A), TO THE UNITEDSTATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF WEST VIRGINIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 5/13/20.5/13/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. *NOT MAILED TO PLAINTIFF. (jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/16/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Transfer filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(SMITH, STACEY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/16/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 000808. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Designation Form)(bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 6/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEGRAND et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAZELTON USP PRIVATE OWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: SUSAN R. BECKER
Represented By: STACEY L.B. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martell A. LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: SUSAN R. BECKER
Represented By: STACEY L.B. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?