Bell v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: Nancy Bell
Defendant: Harrison County Commission, Craig E. Moore and Robert Matheny
Case Number: 1:2020cv00116
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Circuit Court of Harrison County per #13 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF HARRISON COUNTY, WEST VIRGINIA.(Certified copies of #13 Order and public docket sheet.) (wrr)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REMANDING CASE TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF HARRISON COUNTY, WEST VIRGINIA. Based on the agreement of the parties, the Court hereby ORDERS that the case be remanded to the Circuit Court of Harrison County, West Virginia and removed from this Court's active docket. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/10/2020. (wrr)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nancy Bell.(Sims, David)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE HER FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [DKT. NO. 8] Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/10/2020. (wrr)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Conset Order Remanding Case to Circuit Court by Nancy Bell. (Sims, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Conset Order Granting re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff''s Complaint by Nancy Bell. (Sims, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff''s Complaint by Nancy Bell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Sims, David)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS [DKT. NO. #6 ]. The Court GRANTS the motion (Dkt. No. #6 ) and EXTENDS the deadline for Bell to file a response to the #4 motion to dismiss to August 10, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/10/2020. (wrr)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Nancy Bell. (Sims, David)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of by Harrison County Commission re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . (Durst, Tiffany)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Harrison County Commission. (Durst, Tiffany)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 8/12/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/26/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2020 01:30 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 9/16/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 6/19/2020. (dk)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Benjamin D. Adams. (wrr) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/18/2020 with corrected document) (wrr). NEF regenerated.
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Harrison County, West Virginia, (case number 20-C-123), filed by Robert Matheny, Craig E. Moore, Harrison County Commission.Filing Fee $400 PAID Receipt No. 0424-3058775. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Circuit Court docket sheet, #2 Exhibit B-Notice of Filing of Notice Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit C-Complaint for Damages, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County Commission
Represented By: Tiffany R. Durst
Represented By: Nathaniel D. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig E. Moore
Represented By: Tiffany R. Durst
Represented By: Nathaniel D. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Matheny
Represented By: Tiffany R. Durst
Represented By: Nathaniel D. Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Bell
Represented By: David A. Sims
Represented By: Benjamin Dean Adams
Represented By: Louis Dante DiTrapano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?