McCoy v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Travis McCoy
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and SunTrust Bank
Case Number: 1:2020cv00121
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 17 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Cardi, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Michael Gallagher to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Experian. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 7/16/20. (mh)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 PHV Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNE002989 For Attorney Michael Gallagher. (jmm)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Michael Gallagher) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Odell, Ashley)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 WV SOS Return of Service re #6 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA, filed by Travis McCoy. (wrr)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SunTrust Bank identifying Corporate Parent Truist Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Truist Bank, as successor by merger to Suntrust Bank for SunTrust Bank.. (Cooper, Massie)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by SunTrust Bank.(Cooper, Massie)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Cardi, Michael)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Cardi, Michael)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC.. (Roskovensky, Vincent)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Roskovensky, Vincent)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Travis McCoy Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Attachment Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Nissim-Sabat, Michael)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travis McCoy Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Suntrust Bank NKA Truist Bank. (Nissim-Sabat, Michael)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travis McCoy Certificate of Service For Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Nissim-Sabat, Michael)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Travis McCoy Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Nissim-Sabat, Michael)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 8/12/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/26/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2020 02:30 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 9/16/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 6/19/2020. (dk)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Harrison County, WV, (case number 20-C-112-1), filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Filing Fee $400 PAID - Receipt #0424-3059904. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Docket Sheet and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Equifax Joinder and Consent to Removal, #3 Exhibit C-SunTrust Joinder and Consent to Removal, #4 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Vincent M. Roskovensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Clarke Cardi
Represented By: Ashley Hardesty Odell
Represented By: Michael Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Massie P. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis McCoy
Represented By: Michael C. Nissim-Sabat
Represented By: Jennifer S Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?