Roe v. Jenkins
Plaintiff: Arthur Roe
Defendant: Caren Jenkins
Case Number: 1:2020cv00140
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME LIMIT FOR SERVICE by Arthur Roe. (Attachments: #1 Facsimile Cover Sheet)(mh)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to Expedite Determination of Plaintiff's Objections to Report and Recommendation, Temporary Restraining Order and Writ of Habeas Corpus by Arthur Roe. (Attachments: #1 Facsimile Cover Sheet)(mh)
August 16, 2020 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Objections to Report and Recommendation that Plaintiff's Claims Be Dismissed re #13 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Facsimile Cover Sheet)(mh)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS BE DISMISSED re #1 Complaint filed by Arthur Roe, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arthur Roe, #5 MOTION filed by Arthur Roe, #12 MOTION for Hearing filed by Arthur Roe, 2 MOTION to Seal filed by Arthur Roe. Any party shall have fourteen days from the date of filing this Report and Recommendation within which to file with the Clerk of this Court, specific written objections, identifying the portions of the Report and Recommendation to which objection is made, and the basis of such objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/5/20. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion) (Copy PS Plaintiff via cert mail)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR EX-PARTE HEARING ON TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Arthur Roe. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Letter and #7 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 7/24/20. (mh)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002990 (mh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Arthur Roe returning personal check submitted with the filing of this matter. (mh) (To Plaintiff via cert mail w/check) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (To PS Plaintiff via cert mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh).
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERRAL referring case to Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/17/20. (mh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY by Arthur Roe. (mh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS re: #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arthur Roe. (mh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Arthur Roe. (mh)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caren Jenkins, filed by Arthur Roe. (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caren Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?