Westfall v. Trump et al
Plaintiff: Joseph L. Westfall
Defendant: Donald J. Trump and Steven T. Mnuchin
Case Number: 1:2020cv00207
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 OBJECTION to #15 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN RECEIPT as to #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/9/20. (jss)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: The undersigned RECOMMENDS that Plaintiffs Complaint [ECF No. #1 be DISMISSEDWITHOUT PREJUDICE by the District Court. It is further RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. #13 be denied as moot.Any party may within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation file with the Clerk of the Court Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 10/7/20. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 Addendum to #12 Response TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and #13 Motion for Summary Judgment by Joseph L. Westfall. (Attachments: #1 Attachment IRS Reminder, #2 Envelope)(jss)
September 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Joseph L. Westfall. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Joseph L. Westfall to #10 Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 Order to Show Cause. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/14/20. (jss)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Petitioner is ORDERED to show cause within FOURTEEN (14) days from the receipt of this Order as to why his case should not be dismissed without prejudice. (cmrr) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/9/20. (jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jss).
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Joseph L. Westfall returning personal check. (wrr)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 Other Document filed by Joseph L. Westfall regarding filing fee with a personal check. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph L. Westfall. (jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2020: #1 Envelope) (cnd).
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Joseph L. Westfall returning personal check. (wrr) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/26/2020 with corrected letter) (wrr).
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Letter, #3 Notice, #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/22/20. (cnd)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL: The Court REFERS this action to the Honorable Michael J. Aloi, United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct a scheduling conference and issue a scheduling order, for written orders or reports and recommendations, as the case may be, regarding any motions filed, and to dispose of any other matters that may arise. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/19/20. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jss).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to Joseph Westfall. (Attachments: #1 IFP application)(jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jss).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven T. Mnuchin, Donald J. Trump filed by Joseph L. Westfall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfall v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph L. Westfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?