Perdue v. USA
Petitioner: Lamar D. Perdue
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00216
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order on Motion, #8 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/5/2020. (jmm)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME CASE NO. 1:20CV216, DKT. NO #6 . The Court GRANTS the motion and EXTENDS the deadline to file response and transcripts to November 11, 2020 re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Lamar D. Perdue. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/2/2020. (copy counsel of record, copy petitioner via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME CASE NO. 1:20CV216, DKT. NO #6 . The Court GRANTS the motion and EXTENDS the deadline to file transcripts to November 11, 2020 re re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Lamar D. Perdue. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 10/2/2020. (copy counsel of record, copy petitioner via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
September 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by USA. (Flower, Brandon)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice Of General Guidelines. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/8/2020. (jmm)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/8/2020. (jmm)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT TO FILE ANSWER, MOTION, OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING re #1 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/4/2020. (copy pro se petitioner via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro SeIn Federal Court. (copy pro se petitioner via certified mail) (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm).
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Lamar D. Perdue. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration, #3 Envelope)(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perdue v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Brandon Scott Flower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lamar D. Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?