Roller v. Doughnut Joe's LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joanna Roller
Defendant: Robert Garrison and Doughnut Joe's LLC A West Virginia Limited Liability Company doing business as Dunkin' Donuts
Case Number: 1:2020cv00221
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk of Court to Circuit Clerk of Monongalia County, West Virginia regarding #7 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO REMAND [DKT. NO. #5 ] AND CANCELLING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE.(Copy of public docket sheet and certified copy of Order enclosed.) (wrr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2020: #1 Letter returned from State Court acknowledging receipt) (wrr).
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO REMAND [DKT. NO. #5 ] AND CANCELLING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Court GRANTS the motion (Dkt. No. #5 ) and REMANDS this case to the Circuit Court of Monongalia County, West Virginia. The scheduling conference on December 2, 2020, is CANCELED. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/23/2020. (wrr)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Monongalia County. (Attachments: #1 State Court docket sheet, #2 Complaint and Service of Process, #3 Remainder of State Court Record, #4 Letter to Clerk) (wrr)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Doughnut Joe's LLC, Robert Garrison. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Weber, Constance)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 11/4/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/18/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2020 01:30 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 12/9/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/9/2020. (wrr)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Edmund L Wagoner, III (Wagoner, Edmund)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Joanna Roller Change of Attorney Contact Information (Desai, Chirag)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County, West Virginia, (case number 20-C-224), filed by Doughnut Joe's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Circuit Clerk Docket Sheet, #3 Consent to Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Filing Fee $400 PAID. Receipt #0424-3111537.(wrr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roller v. Doughnut Joe's LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Garrison
Represented By: Erin J Webb
Represented By: Brandy D. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doughnut Joe's LLC A West Virginia Limited Liability Company doing business as Dunkin' Donuts
Represented By: Constance H. Weber
Represented By: Lindsay M. Gainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanna Roller
Represented By: Chirag Desai
Represented By: Edmund L Wagoner, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?