Valhalla Housing III, LLC v. Guilford Realty, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Valhalla Housing III, LLC
Defendant: Guilford Realty, LLC, Guilford Corporate Tax Credit Fund XIX, Ltd., 1997 Fund XV Series A, Ltd., 1998 Fund XVIII Series, Ltd., Guilford Tax Credit Fund 27, LP and Hunt ELP, LTD.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00223
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines by 1997 Fund XV Series A, Ltd., 1998 Fund XVIII Series, Ltd., Guilford Corporate Tax Credit Fund XIX, Ltd., Guilford Realty, LLC, Guilford Tax Credit Fund 27, LP, Hunt ELP, LTD.. (Cardi, Michael)
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Hunt ELP, Ltd. by 1997 Fund XV Series A, Ltd., 1998 Fund XVIII Series, Ltd., Guilford Corporate Tax Credit Fund XIX, Ltd., Guilford Realty, LLC, Guilford Tax Credit Fund 27, LP, Hunt ELP, LTD.. (Cardi, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by 1997 Fund XV Series A, Ltd., 1998 Fund XVIII Series, Ltd., Guilford Corporate Tax Credit Fund XIX, Ltd., Guilford Realty, LLC, Guilford Tax Credit Fund 27, LP, Hunt ELP, LTD.. (Cardi, Michael)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Valhalla Housing III, LLC. (Pappas, Keith)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Brian P. Donnelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/22/2020. (dk)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Louis E. Dolan, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/22/2020. (dk)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee received for B. Donnelly and L. Dolan: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC003022. (dk)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Brian P. Donnelly by 1997 Fund XV Series A, Ltd., 1998 Fund XVIII Series, Ltd., Guilford Corporate Tax Credit Fund XIX, Ltd., Guilford Realty, LLC, Guilford Tax Credit Fund 27, LP, Hunt ELP, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Cardi, Michael)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Louis E. Dolan, Jr. by 1997 Fund XV Series A, Ltd., 1998 Fund XVIII Series, Ltd., Guilford Corporate Tax Credit Fund XIX, Ltd., Guilford Realty, LLC, Guilford Tax Credit Fund 27, LP, Hunt ELP, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Cardi, Michael)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 1997 Fund XV Series A, Ltd., 1998 Fund XVIII Series, Ltd., Guilford Corporate Tax Credit Fund XIX, Ltd., Guilford Realty, LLC, Guilford Tax Credit Fund 27, LP, Hunt ELP, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum)(Cardi, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valhalla Housing III, LLC re #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Pappas, Keith)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valhalla Housing III, LLC. (Pappas, Keith)
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court Of Monongalia County. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Service, #3 Notice Of Filing Notice Of Removal, #4 cover letter) (jmm)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/13/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/27/2020. Discovery due by 11/13/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/11/20. (mh)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1997 Fund XV Series A, Ltd., 1998 Fund XVIII Series, Ltd., Guilford Corporate Tax Credit Fund XIX, Ltd., Guilford Realty, LLC, Guilford Tax Credit Fund 27, LP, Hunt ELP, LTD.. (Cardi, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Donnelly and Dolan. (mh)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County, (case number 20-C-230), filed by Guilford Tax Credit Fund 27, LP, Guilford Corporate Tax Credit Fund XIX, Ltd., 1998 Fund XVIII Series, Ltd., Guilford Realty, LLC, Hunt ELP, LTD., 1997 Fund XV Series A, Ltd. (Filing Fee Paid $400. Receipt #0424-3113666). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WVSOS Online Data, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ryan Trane, #3 Exhibit C - Service of Process, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (dk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valhalla Housing III, LLC v. Guilford Realty, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valhalla Housing III, LLC
Represented By: Keith J. Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guilford Realty, LLC
Represented By: Louis E. Dolan, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart A. McMillan
Represented By: Michael Clarke Cardi
Represented By: Brian P. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guilford Corporate Tax Credit Fund XIX, Ltd.
Represented By: Louis E. Dolan, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart A. McMillan
Represented By: Michael Clarke Cardi
Represented By: Brian P. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1997 Fund XV Series A, Ltd.
Represented By: Louis E. Dolan, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart A. McMillan
Represented By: Michael Clarke Cardi
Represented By: Brian P. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1998 Fund XVIII Series, Ltd.
Represented By: Louis E. Dolan, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart A. McMillan
Represented By: Michael Clarke Cardi
Represented By: Brian P. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guilford Tax Credit Fund 27, LP
Represented By: Louis E. Dolan, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart A. McMillan
Represented By: Michael Clarke Cardi
Represented By: Brian P. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt ELP, LTD.
Represented By: Louis E. Dolan, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart A. McMillan
Represented By: Michael Clarke Cardi
Represented By: Brian P. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?