Arehart v. Harrison County Senior Citizens Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth Arehart
Defendant: Harrison County Senior Citizens Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00252
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Scheduling Order Checklist Other Document re #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Kenneth Arehart. (Harrold, Samuel)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Harrold, Samuel)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 12/11/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/29/2020. Discovery due by 1/12/2021. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 11/10/20. (mh)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER : Case reassigned to District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley no longer assigned to case Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/10/20. (mh)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Harrison County Senior Citizens Center, Inc..(Lazar, Alyssa)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Harrison County Circuit Court. (mh)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harrison County Senior Citizens Center, Inc.. (Lazar, Alyssa)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Harrison County Senior Citizens Center, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Proof of Notice of Removal and Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court (Lazar, Alyssa)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Harrison County Circuit Court, (case number 20-C-244), filed by Harrison County Senior Citizens Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arehart v. Harrison County Senior Citizens Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County Senior Citizens Center, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Merinar, Jr.
Represented By: Alyssa Louise Lazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Arehart
Represented By: Samuel H. Harrold, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?