Field v. State of West Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Dale P. Field, Jr.
Defendant: John Doe #1, Bryan Kelly Lanham, State of West Virginia, Betsy Jividen, John Doe #3 and John Doe #2
Case Number: 1:2020cv00280
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 NOTICE of Deficient Pleading and Intent to Dismiss. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/12/2021. (jmm)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 Mail sent to Dale P. Field, Jr. #6 Notice (Other), Returned as Undeliverable. "Unclaimed." (first attempt at service) (mh)
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficient Pleading and Intent to Dismiss. (To PS Plaintiff via cert mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2020: #1 42:1983 Form, #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/3/2021: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt (2nd Attempt at Service)) (mh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/17/2021: #4 Certified Mail Return Receipt "Third Attempt") (mh).
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00804. (mh)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE directing that this matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Elkins Division. Plaintiff is directed to address any further filings concerning this matter to that court. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 12/30/2020. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se) (arb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 12/30/2020.]
December 11, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 12/30/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 12/30/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (arb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 12/30/2020.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Dale P. Field, Jr. to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs (arb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 12/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Field v. State of West Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale P. Field, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Kelly Lanham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Jividen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?