Bayer Pharma AG et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer AG and Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Mylan Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00099
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene M Keeley
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Applications (ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TRANSFERING CASE: The Court ORDERS that the above-styled civilaction be transferred to and placed on the docket of the HonorableThomas S. Kleeh, United States District Judge. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/15/21. (jss)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #36 Motion of Bruce R. Genderson for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/3/2021. (dk)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #34 Motion of Kathryn S. Kayali for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/3/2021. (dk)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #35 Motion of Julie Tavares for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer AG. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/3/2021. (dk)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #33 Motion of Alexander S. Zolan for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer AG. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 9/3/2021. (dk)
September 3, 2021 Filing 39 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Status Conference held on 9/3/2021. (Court Reporter Jill Cutter) (dk)
September 2, 2021 Filing 38 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid for Bruce Genderson: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002816. (dk) Modified to correct typographical error on 9/3/2021 (dk).
September 2, 2021 Filing 37 Pro hac vice Filing fees for Zolan, Kaylai and Tavares : $ 600.00, receipt number wvmw002815 (jss)
September 2, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Bruce Genderson by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Chad)
September 2, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Julie Tavares by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Chad)
September 2, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kathryn Kayali by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Chad)
September 2, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexander Zolan by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Chad)
August 31, 2021 Filing 32 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for A. Langford: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC003302 (jss)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion of Andrew T. Langford for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/30/2021. (dk)
August 27, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrew T. Langford by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Chad)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #23 Motion of Dov P. Grossman for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/27/2021. (dk)
August 27, 2021 Filing 28 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for D. Grossman: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC003300 (jss)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Wendy L. Devine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mylan Inc. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/27/2021. (dk)
August 27, 2021 Filing 26 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee as to Wendy L. Devine PAID: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC003299. (wrr)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Elham Firouzi Steiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mylan Inc. and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/27/2021. (dk)
August 27, 2021 Filing 24 Pro Hac Vice Fee for Elham Firouzi Steiner Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC003298 (jss) (Main Document 24 replaced on 8/27/2021 with correct document) (wrr).
August 27, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dov P. Grossman by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Chad)
August 26, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hav Vice (Wendy L. Devine) by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
August 26, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hav Vice (Elham Firouzi Steiner) by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF LOCAL COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS BAYER PHARMA AG AND BAYER AG: It is ORDERED that Steven Ruby and Raymond Franks are permitted to withdraw as counsel for Bayer and Frank Simmerman, Jr., Chad Taylor, and Frank Simmerman, III, are hereby substituted as counsel of record for Bayer. Attorney Raymond S Franks, II and Steven Robert Ruby terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/26/2021. (cnd)
August 25, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Local Counsel by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ruby, Steven)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE: The Court SCHEDULES a status conference by telephone for Friday, September 3, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/24/21. (jss)
August 23, 2021 Filing 17 Request for Status Conference ( Other Document ) filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (O'Brien, William)
August 16, 2021 Filing 16 Courtesy copy documents filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Transfer of Action to the District of Delaware, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Proof of Service) (dk)
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Mylan Inc. waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Taylor, Chad)
August 16, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 8/12/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Taylor, Chad)
August 16, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Mylan Inc. on 8/12/21 by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 9/13/2021. (Taylor, Chad)
August 16, 2021 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. on 8/12/21 by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Waiver of Service due by 9/13/2021. (Taylor, Chad)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/22/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/5/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in Judge Keeley Chambers before Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley. Discovery due by 12/3/2021. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/13/21. (jss)
August 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon H. Copland on behalf of Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Copland, Gordon)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Thomas D. Rein's #7 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/3/21. (jss)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Thomas D. Rein: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC003276 (jss)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas D. Rein by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Chad)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Taylor, Chad)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG. (wrr)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorneys Bruce Genderson, Dov Grossman, Alexander Zolan, Kathryn Kayali, Julie Tavares, Thomas Rein. (dk)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (dk)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Bayer AG. Filing Fee $402. Receipt #AWVNDC-3299654. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayer Pharma AG et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer Pharma AG
Represented By: Alexander S. Zolan
Represented By: Bruce R. Genderson
Represented By: Chad L Taylor
Represented By: Dov P. Grossman
Represented By: Frank E. Simmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Frank Edward Simmerman, III
Represented By: Julie L. Tavares
Represented By: Kathryn S. Kayali
Represented By: Raymond S Franks, II
Represented By: Steven Robert Ruby
Represented By: Thomas D. Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer AG
Represented By: Alexander S. Zolan
Represented By: Bruce R. Genderson
Represented By: Chad L Taylor
Represented By: Dov P. Grossman
Represented By: Frank E. Simmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Frank Edward Simmerman, III
Represented By: Julie L. Tavares
Represented By: Kathryn S. Kayali
Represented By: Raymond S Franks, II
Represented By: Steven Robert Ruby
Represented By: Thomas D. Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander S. Zolan
Represented By: Bruce R. Genderson
Represented By: Chad L Taylor
Represented By: Dov P. Grossman
Represented By: Frank E. Simmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Frank Edward Simmerman, III
Represented By: Julie L. Tavares
Represented By: Kathryn S. Kayali
Represented By: Raymond S Franks, II
Represented By: Steven Robert Ruby
Represented By: Thomas D. Rein
Represented By: Andrew T. Langford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Elham Firouzi Steiner
Represented By: Wendy L. Devine
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Represented By: Elham Firouzi Steiner
Represented By: Wendy L. Devine
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?