Jessup v. Sandy et al
Plaintiff: Hunter Jessup
Defendant: Jeff S. Sandy, Betsy Jividen, John Sheeley, Dontrewell E. Kelly, Steven Zitmeyer, Abraham Arthur Bean, John Michael Anderson and First Name Unknown Costello
Case Number: 1:2021cv00125
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: John Preston Bailey
2 Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
3 Judge: James P Mazzone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Jessup's Complaint filed by Betsy Jividen, Jeff S. Sandy, John Sheeley. (Whitler, Matthew)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss , #2 MOTION to Dismiss , #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Michael Anderson, Abraham Arthur Bean, Dontrewell E. Kelly, Steven Zitmeyer. (Dunham, Michael)
October 20, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #3 MOTION to Dismiss , #2 MOTION to Dismiss , #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Hunter Jessup. (Riddell, Christian)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRNG CASES. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 10/5/2021. Copy to pro se parties by cm,rrr.(cmd)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #3 MOTION to Dismiss , #2 MOTION to Dismiss , #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Hunter Jessup. (Riddell, Christian)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ADMINISTRATOR DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JESSUP by Betsy Jividen, Jeff S. Sandy, John Sheeley re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint of Jessup. (Whitler, Matthew)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 Attorney filed document in wrong case. Please see case 3:21-cv-150 docket entry #6 for corrected Memo. NEF regen. (Whitler, Matthew) Modified on 9/24/2021 (cmd).
September 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Betsy Jividen, Jeff S. Sandy, John Sheeley. (Whitler, Matthew)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Dontrewell E. Kelly, Steven Zitmeyer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Dunham, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by John Michael Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Dunham, Michael)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by Abraham Arthur Bean. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Dunham, Michael)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Berkley County Circuit Clerk, (case number CC02-2021-C-122), filed by Jeff S. Sandy, John Sheeley, Dontrewell E. Kelly, John Michael Anderson, Steven Zitmeyer, Betsy Jividen, Abraham Arthur Bean. Filing Fee Paid $402. Receipt #AWVNDC-3339522 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Docs.)(jmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jessup v. Sandy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Jessup
Represented By: Christian Riddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff S. Sandy
Represented By: Matthew R. Whitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Jividen
Represented By: Matthew R. Whitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sheeley
Represented By: Matthew R. Whitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dontrewell E. Kelly
Represented By: Kathryn Victoria McCann-Slaughter
Represented By: Michael Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Zitmeyer
Represented By: Kathryn Victoria McCann-Slaughter
Represented By: Michael Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Arthur Bean
Represented By: Kathryn Victoria McCann-Slaughter
Represented By: Michael Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Michael Anderson
Represented By: Kathryn Victoria McCann-Slaughter
Represented By: Michael Dunham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Name Unknown Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?