Silbaugh et al v. Monongalia Health System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Silbaugh, Robin Stripling and Michael Stripling
Defendant: Monongalia Health System, Inc., Monongalia County General Hospital Company, Stonewall Jackson Memorial Hospital Company and Preston Memorial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2022cv00033
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2022 Filing 27 DISMISSAL ORDER. DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/4/2022. (jb)
August 3, 2022 Filing 26 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Rachel Silbaugh, Michael Stripling, Robin Stripling. (Troy, Mark)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sean E. McIntyre filed by Monongalia Health System, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 7/19/2022. (Copy counsel of record)(jmm)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David A. Carney filed by Monongalia Health System, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 7/19/2022. (Copy counsel of record)(jmm)
July 19, 2022 Filing 23 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC003478 for Attorneys David A. Carney and Sean E. McIntyre. (jmm)
July 15, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sean E. McIntyre by Monongalia Health System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Jessee, Russell)
July 15, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David A. Carney by Monongalia Health System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Jessee, Russell)
July 12, 2022 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #17 MOTION to Dismiss --Oral Argument Requested Stipulated Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Respond by Rachel Silbaugh, Michael Stripling, Robin Stripling. (Troy, Mark)
June 30, 2022 Filing 19 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorney David A. Carney. (dk)
June 29, 2022 Filing 18 Memorandum in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss --Oral Argument Requested filed by Monongalia Health System, Inc.. (Jessee, Russell)
June 29, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss --Oral Argument Requested by Monongalia Health System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Jessee, Russell)
June 24, 2022 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Until July 1, 2022 by Monongalia Health System, Inc.. (Jessee, Russell)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #13 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Francesca Kester filed by Michael Stripling, Robin Stripling, Rachel Silbaugh Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 04/22/2022. (kam)
April 22, 2022 Filing 13 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Francesca Kester by Rachel Silbaugh, Michael Stripling, Robin Stripling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Troy, Mark)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jean Sutton Martin. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 4/20/2022. (jmm)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David K. Lietz. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 4/20/2022. (jmm)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gary M. Klinger. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 4/20/2022. (jmm)
April 20, 2022 Filing 9 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC003429 attorneys F. Kester and J. Martin. (jmm)
April 20, 2022 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC003428 for Attorneys David Leitz and Gary Kinger. (jmm)
April 20, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Francesca Kester by Rachel Silbaugh, Michael Stripling, Robin Stripling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Troy, Mark)
April 20, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jean Sutton Martin by Rachel Silbaugh, Michael Stripling, Robin Stripling. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Troy, Mark)
April 19, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary M. Klinger by Rachel Silbaugh, Michael Stripling, Robin Stripling. (Troy, Mark)
April 19, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David K. Lietz by Rachel Silbaugh, Michael Stripling, Robin Stripling. (Troy, Mark)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for David Lietz, Francesca Kester, Gary M. Klinger, Jean S. Martin. (jmm)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Stripling, Rachel Silbaugh, Robin Stripling. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee PAID $402. Receipt #AWVNDC-3461750. (jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2022: #2 Exhibit 1) (jmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silbaugh et al v. Monongalia Health System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Silbaugh
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Mark E. Troy
Represented By: David Lietz
Represented By: Francesca Kester
Represented By: Jean S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Stripling
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Mark E. Troy
Represented By: David Lietz
Represented By: Francesca Kester
Represented By: Jean S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stripling
Represented By: Gary M. Klinger
Represented By: Mark E. Troy
Represented By: David Lietz
Represented By: Francesca Kester
Represented By: Jean S. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monongalia Health System, Inc.
Represented By: David A. Carney
Represented By: Sean E. McIntyre
Represented By: Russell D. Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monongalia County General Hospital Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonewall Jackson Memorial Hospital Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston Memorial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?