Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Plaintiff: Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00061
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to #77 Other Document. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Ruby, Steven)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Other Document Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.s Post-Hearing Supplement filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Copland, Gordon)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ENTRY: ***NOTICE*** THE ATTACHED DOCUMENT IS NOT ACCESSIBLE. IT IS FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY. Proceedings held before Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh. Status Conference held on 9/28/2022. (Court Reporter Rachel Kocher) (dk)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Ruby, Steven)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures. (Ruby, Steven)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE for 9/28/2022 02:30 PM, via Zoom videoconferencing, before Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 9/20/2022. (dk)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #68 Motion of Katie A. Body for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 9/20/2022. (dk)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Regeneron's Second Requests for Production of Documents and things to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Ruby, Steven)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.'s ANSWER to #47 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Ruby, Steven)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC003515 for Attorney K. Boda. (jmm)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Katie A. Boda) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #56 Motion of Abraham J. Varon for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 9/13/2022. (dk)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PHV Filing fee for A. Varon in the amount of $ 200.00. Receipt number WVNC03508. (jb)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jeffrey A. Marx) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 9/6/2022. (jb)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Thomas H. Ehrich) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 9/6/2022. (jb)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Steven J. Birkos) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 9/6/2022. (jb)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Lawrence Scott Beall) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 9/6/2022. (jb)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Heinz J. Salmen) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 9/6/2022. (jb)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Eric R. Hunt) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 9/6/2022. (jb)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Neil B. McLaughlin) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 9/6/2022. (jb)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (William A. Rakoczy) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 9/6/2022. (jb)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Lauren M. Lesko) filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 9/6/2022. (jb)
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Abraham J. Varon) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. First Requests for Production to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Pogue, David)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. First Set of Interrogatories to Mylan Pharmaceuticals In.c. (Pogue, David)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee in the amount of $ 800.00 for attorneys J. Marx, T. Ehrich, S. Birkos and L. Beall. Receipt number WVNC003502. (jb)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jeffrey A. Marx) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Thomas H. Ehrich) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Steven J. Birkos) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Lawrence Scott Beall) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, William)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee in the amount of $ 1,000.00 for L. Lesko, W. Rakoczy, N. McLaughlin, E. Hunt & H. Salmen. Receipt number WVNC003501. (jb)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(O'Brien, William)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Heinz J. Salmen) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Copland, Gordon)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Eric R. Hunt) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Copland, Gordon)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Neil B. McLaughlin) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Copland, Gordon)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (William A. Rakoczy) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Copland, Gordon)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Lauren M. Lesko) by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Copland, Gordon)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Hearing - Requesting Expedited Status Conference filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Pogue, David)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #15 Motion of Shaun P. Mahaffy for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/22/2022. (dk)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #16 Motion of Thomas S. Fletcher for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/22/2022. (dk)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #17 Motion of Teagan J. Gregory for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/22/2022. (dk)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #21 Motion of Petra Scamborova for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/22/2022. (dk)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #22 Motion of Larry Coury for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/22/2022. (dk)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #23 Motion of James Evans for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/22/2022. (dk)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #10 Motion of Andrew V. Trask for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/22/2022. (dk)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #11 Motion of David I. Berl for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/22/2022. (dk)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #12 Motion of Ellen E. Oberwetter for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/22/2022. (dk)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #13 Motion of Kathryn S. Kayali for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/22/2022. (dk)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #14 Motion of Nicholas W. Jordan for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/22/2022. (dk)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #9 Motion of Adam Pan for leave to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/22/2022. (dk)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #8 Motion of Arthur J. Argall, III for leave to appear Pro Hac Vice on behaf of Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/22/2022. (dk)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION issued to Attorneys W. Rakoczy, H. Salmen, E. Hunt, N. McLaughlin, and L. Lesko. (dk)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Hearing - Requesting Expedited Status Conference filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (O'Brien, William)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc., Corporate Parent Viatris Inc. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc... (O'Brien, William)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Filing fee for Pro Hac Vice admission of J. Evans, L. Coury and P. Scamborova in the amount of $ 600.00. Receipt number WVNC003495. (jb)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for James Evans Other Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment WVSB Receipt)(Ruby, Steven) Modified to make a pending motion on 8/18/2022 (dk).
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Larry Coury Other Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment WVSB Receipt)(Ruby, Steven) Modified to make a pending motion on 8/18/2022 (dk).
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Petra Scamborova Other Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment WVSB Receipt)(Ruby, Steven) Modified to make a pending motion on 8/18/2022 (dk).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for T. Gregory, T. Fletcher, S. Mahaffy, N. Jordan, K. Kayali, E. Oberwetter, D. Berl, A. Trask, A. Pan and A. Argall: $2,000.00. Receipt number WVNC003489. (jb)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 9/9/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/23/2022. Discovery due by 10/10/2022. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 8/10/2022. (dk)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon H. Copland on behalf of Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Copland, Gordon)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Teagan J. Gregory Other Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit WVSB Receipt)(Ruby, Steven) Modified to make pending motion on 8/10/2022 (dk).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas S. Fletcher Other Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit WVSB Receipt)(Ruby, Steven) Modified to make pending motion on 8/10/2022 (dk).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shaun P. Mahaffy Other Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit WVSB Receipt)(Ruby, Steven) Modified to make a pending motion on 8/10/2022 (dk).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas W. Jordan Other Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit WVSB Receipt)(Ruby, Steven) Modified to make a pending motion on 8/10/2022 (dk).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathryn S. Kayali Other Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit WVSB Receipt)(Ruby, Steven) Modified to make a pending motion on 8/10/2022 (dk).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ellen E. Oberwetter Other Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit WVSB Receipt)(Ruby, Steven) Modified to make a pending motion on 8/10/2022 (dk).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David I. Berl Other Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Exhibit WVSB Receipt)(Ruby, Steven) Modified to make a pending motion on 8/10/2022 (dk).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew V. Trask Other Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit WVSB Receipt)(Ruby, Steven) Modified to make a pending motion on 8/10/2022 (dk).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam Pan Other Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit WVSB Receipt)(Ruby, Steven) Modified to make a pending motion on 8/10/2022 (dk).
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arthur J. Argall III Other Document filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit WVSB Receipt)(Ruby, Steven) Modified to make a pending motion on 8/10/2022 (dk).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Hearing - Requesting Expedited Status Conference by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Ruby, Steven)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 8/4/2022. (Pogue, David)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Pogue, David)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT to USPTO on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. (dk)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION issued to D. Berl, E. Oberwetter, T. Fletcher, A. Trask, T. Gregory, S. Mahaffy, K. Kayali, A. Argall, A. Pan, and N. Jordan. (dk)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Filing Fee $402. Receipt #AWVNDC-3522822. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Patent 7,070,959 B1, #2 Exhibit 2 - US Patent 9,222,106 B2, #3 Exhibit 3 - US Patent 9,254,338 B2, #4 Exhibit 4 - US Patent 9,669,069 B2, #5 Exhibit 5 - US Patent 9,816,110 B2, #6 Exhibit 6 - US Patent 10,130,681 B2, #7 Exhibit 7 - US Patent 10,406,226 B2, #8 Exhibit 8 - US Patent 10,415,055 B2, #9 Exhibit 9 - US Patent 10,464,992 B2, #10 Exhibit 10 - US Patent 10,669,594 B2, #11 Exhibit 11 - US Patent 10,857,205 B2, #12 Exhibit 12 - US Patent 10,888,601 B2, #13 Exhibit 13 - US Patent 10,927,342 B2, #14 Exhibit 14 - US Patent 10,973,879 B2, #15 Exhibit 15 - US Patent 11,053,280 B2, #16 Exhibit 16 - US Patent 11,066,458 B2, #17 Exhibit 17 - US Patent 11,084,865 B2, #18 Exhibit 18 - US Patent 11,104,715 B2, #19 Exhibit 19 - US Patent 11,174,283 B2, #20 Exhibit 20 - US Patent 11,186,625 B2, #21 Exhibit 21 - US Patent 11,253,572 B2, #22 Exhibit 22 - US Patent 11,299,532 B2, #23 Exhibit 23 - US Patent 11,306,135 B2, #24 Exhibit 24 - US Patent 11,332,771 B2, #25 Civil Cover Sheet, #26 Proposed AO120 Form)(dk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Pan
Represented By: Andrew V. Trask
Represented By: Arthur J. Argall, III
Represented By: David I. Berl
Represented By: David R. Pogue
Represented By: Ellen E. Oberwetter
Represented By: Kathryn S. Kayali
Represented By: Nicholas Jordan
Represented By: Shaun P. Mahaffy
Represented By: Steven Robert Ruby
Represented By: Teagan J. Gregory
Represented By: Thomas S. Fletcher
Represented By: James Evans
Represented By: Larry Coury
Represented By: Petra Scamborova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Abraham J. Varon
Represented By: Eric R. Hunt
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Heinz J. Salmen
Represented By: Jeffery A. Marx
Represented By: Katie A. Boda
Represented By: Lauren M. Lesko
Represented By: Lawrence Scott Beall
Represented By: Neil B. McLaughlin
Represented By: Steven J. Birkos
Represented By: Thomas H. Ehrich
Represented By: William J O'Brien
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?