Heck v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lila Heck
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi US Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00087
Filed: November 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion of Christopher S. McRae for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 11/27/2023. (dk)
November 17, 2023 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 100003766. (snc)
November 17, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher S. McRae by Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Proctor, Jason)
November 13, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi S.A. for Sanofi US Services, Inc... (Proctor, Jason)
November 13, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi S.A. for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.. (Proctor, Jason)
November 10, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Bonasso, Michael)
November 10, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Proctor on behalf of Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Proctor, Jason)
November 6, 2023 Filing 9 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Attorneys Ethan Shaw, John Cowart, Christopher McRae, and Stephen Nichols. (dk)
November 6, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-16537. (dk)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to Northern District of West Virginia. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, 16511)(nml) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/6/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer of Orders, #2 Exhibit B - PTO, #3 Exhibit C - CMO, #4 Exhibit D - Pleadings, #5 Exhibit E - Orders on Dispositive Motions, #6 Exhibit F - Daubert Orders, #7 Exhibit G - MIL Orders)(Britton, Mary) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/6/2023.]
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/6/2023.]
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/6/2023.]
January 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (mm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/6/2023.]
December 18, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/6/2023.]
December 10, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, separately and d/b/a Winthrop U.S. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6526785) filed by Lila Heck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Ethan L. Shaw added to party Lila Heck (pty:pla).(Shaw, Ethan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/6/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heck v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Jason A. Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher S McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Jason A. Proctor
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S McRae
Represented By: Jason A. Proctor
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lila Heck
Represented By: Ethan L. Shaw
Represented By: John P. Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?