Isra El v. USAA et al
Plaintiff: D'Annie Isra El
Defendant: USAA, Mr. Cooper and RightPath Servicing
Case Number: 1:2023cv00095
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2023 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/1/2023 per USPS site. (hrc)
December 4, 2023 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/1/2023 per USPS site. (hrc)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/1/2023 per USPS site. (hrc)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION [ECF NO. #2 ] TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVITS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 11/28/2023. (copy to pro se plaintiff by cm rrr) (hrc) (hrc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2023: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (hrc).
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Referring case to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 11/27/2023. (copy to pro se plaintiff via cm rrr ; copy to MJA chambers via email) (hrc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2023: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (hrc).
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (Copy to Pro Se Plaintiff by cm/rrr) (snc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2023: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (snc).
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by D'Annie Isra El. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (snc)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Releife against Mr. Cooper, RightPath Servicing, USAA filed by D'Annie Isra El. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summonses, #6 Consent to Receive NEFs) (snc) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/27/2023 - page 2 was missing) (snc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isra El v. USAA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Annie Isra El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RightPath Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?