Clark v. Dankwa et al
Plaintiff: Brent Clark
Defendant: Doctor Vibeke Dankwa and Patricia Corbin
Case Number: 1:2024cv00017
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2024 Filing 24 Plaintiff Response to Motion for Order to Show Cause filed by Brent Clark. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (snc)
April 5, 2024 Filing 23 Plaintiff RESPONSE to #18 Motion to Dismiss filed by Brent Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope) (snc)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION (ECF NO. #20 ) TO STAY DISCOVERY. Defendants' #20 motion is hereby GRANTED. The deadlines set forth in the Court's Scheduling Order #14 are hereby suspended until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 04/04/2024. (Copy to Pro Se Plaintiff by cm/rrr) (snc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2024: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (snc).
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ROSEBORO NOTICE re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Within 21 days from the date of this Order, the pro se party shall file any opposition to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 04/04/2024. (Copy to Pro Se Plaintiff by cm/rrr) (snc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2024: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (snc).
April 3, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss by Patricia Corbin, Doctor Vibeke Dankwa. (Nogay, Maximillian)
March 27, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Patricia Corbin, Doctor Vibeke Dankwa. (Nogay, Maximillian)
March 27, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Patricia Corbin, Doctor Vibeke Dankwa. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Nogay, Maximillian)
March 14, 2024 Filing 17 RETURN RECEIPT for Brent Clark as to #14 Scheduling Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 03/11/2024. (snc)
March 13, 2024 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Patricia Corbin, Doctor Vibeke Dankwa. (Nogay, Maximillian)
March 13, 2024 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Reply for #10 Motion to Remand filed by Brent Clark. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Responses, #2 Attachment 2 - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Attachment 3 - Manual, #4 Attachment 8 - Transcript, #5 Attachment 9 - Transcript, #6 Envelope) (snc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2024: #7 Attachment 4 - Medical Records, #8 Attachment 5 - Medical Records, #9 Attachment 6 - Medical Records, #10 Attachment 7 - Medical Records) (snc). (Documents sealed per MJA).
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER CANCELLING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. It is hereby ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference previously set before the undersigned on March 28, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. is hereby CANCELLED. Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 7/29/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 1/27/2025. Discovery due by 2/3/2025. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/17/2025. Final Pretrial Conference/Settlement Conference set for 3/31/2025 12:00 PM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 4/15/2025 09:30 AM in Clarksburg District Judge Courtroom, 2nd Floor before Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh. It is anticipated that the trial will take five days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 3/7/2024. (Copy PS Plaintiff by CM,RRR) (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2024: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk).
March 6, 2024 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Patricia Corbin, Doctor Vibeke Dankwa. (Nogay, Maximillian)
March 4, 2024 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Nogay, Maximillian)
February 28, 2024 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate's Order granting an extension of time and Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions by Brent Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Clerk's Entry of Default, #4 Envelope)(snc)
February 23, 2024 Filing 10 Pro Se Amended MOTION to Remand by Brent Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Envelope) (snc)
February 20, 2024 Filing 9 Pro Se MOTION to Remand by Brent Clark. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket) (snc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2024: #2 Envelope) (snc).
February 20, 2024 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT for Brent Clark as to #3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 02/17/2024. (snc)
February 20, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT for Brent Clark as to #2 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 02/17/2024. (snc)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION ECF NO. #5 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Defendants' answer(s) due 3/29/2024. (Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff by CM/RRR). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 2/20/2024. (mas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2024: #1 Attachment Certified Mail Receipt) (mas).
February 16, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond by Patricia Corbin, Doctor Vibeke Dankwa. (Nogay, Maximillian)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 3/14/2024. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/21/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2024 at 11:00 AM by Zoom before Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Discovery due by 4/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 02/14/2024. (Copy to pro se Plaintiff by cm/rrr) (snc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2024: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (snc).
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL. The Court REFERS this matter to the Honorable Michael J. Aloi, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 02/13/2024. (Copy to pro se Plaintiff by cm/rrr; copy to MJ Aloi by email) (snc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2024: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (snc).
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (Copy to pro se plaintiff by cm/rrr) (snc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2024: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (snc).
February 12, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Monongalia County, (case number 23-C-343), filed by Doctor Vibeke Dankwa, Patricia Corbin. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 State Court Papers, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (No filing fee required) (snc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Dankwa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Vibeke Dankwa
Represented By: Jordan Vincent Palmer
Represented By: Maximillian F. Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Corbin
Represented By: Jordan Vincent Palmer
Represented By: Maximillian F. Nogay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?