Barnes v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Barbara Barnes
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00088
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ashley Hardesty Odell (Odell, Ashley) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/17/2018) (njz). Modified on 10/17/2018-converted to pdf (njz).
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 11/2/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/16/2018. Discovery due by 12/3/2018. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/2/18. (njz)
October 2, 2018 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Odell, Ashley) Modified on 10/2/2018-converted to pdf (njz). (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/2/2018) (njz).
October 2, 2018 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Odell, Ashley)
September 14, 2018 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed via WVSOS as to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 9/11/2018. (cnd)
August 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company filed by Barbara Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Case filing began in CM/ECF shell case, with filing fee being paid through pay.gov on (8/29/2018). However, filer failed to complete filing process, following receipt of payment. Clerk's office notified filer of the incomplete document filing and complaint was received on (8/30/2018)(njz) Filing Fee PAID ON 8/29/2018 $400 - Receipt #0424-2656355

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashley Hardesty Odell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Barnes
Represented By: Kala Leane Sowers
Represented By: Dino S. Colombo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?