Stroup v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: Frankie William Stroup, Jr.
Defendant: John Justice, Jennifer Fleming, David Sudbeck, Shevona Lusk and Patrick Ryan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00015
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ROSEBORO NOTICE: re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by John Justice, Patrick Ryan. Within 21 days from the date of this Order, the pro se party shall file any opposition to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 4/15/19. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
April 9, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by John Justice, Patrick Ryan re #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Lilly, Jeffery)
April 9, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by John Justice, Patrick Ryan. (Lilly, Jeffery)
March 20, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Patrick Ryan served on 3/19/2019. (njz)
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to John Justice served on 3/19/2019. (njz)
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN RECEIPT as to #13 Order on Public Motion. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/18/19. (njz)
March 12, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/8/19. (njz)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for the Service of Summons. The Clerk of the Court is hereby DIRECTED to issue a twenty-one day summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 3/11/19. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 Pro Se MOTION for the Service of Summons by Frankie William Stroup, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 proposed summons) envelope attached to #11 (njz)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT by Frankie William Stroup, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(njz)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/3/19. (njz)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #3 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 3/4/19. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 2/28/19. (njz) copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT: The Court grants #2 plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send summonses to Plaintiff at his address on the docket. The Court ORDERS and NOTICES Plaintiff shall stipulate in an affidavit that any recovery in the action shall, pursuant to the order of the Court, be paid to the Clerk, who shall pay therefrom any remaining unpaid costs taxed against the Plaintiff and remit the balance to the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 2/25/19. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt with blank summonses)(jss)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/23/19. (njz)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se In Federal Court. (njz) Copy mailed to pro se pla via cert. return rec't mail (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (njz).
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Envelope Received re: #1 , #2 , #3 . (njz)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Frankie William Stroup, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration in Support)(njz)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frankie William Stroup, Jr. (njz)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennifer Fleming, John Justice, Shevona Lusk, Patrick Ryan, David Sudbeck filed by Frankie William Stroup, Jr. (Attachments: #1 various letters, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 proposed summons)(njz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stroup v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Justice
Represented By: Jeffery W. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sudbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shevona Lusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Ryan
Represented By: Jeffery W. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie William Stroup, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?