Judy v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.

Plaintiff: Richard Scott Judy
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00022
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS: It is ORDERED that this case is STAYED until August 1, 2019. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 4/26/19. (cnd)
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, E.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Technology, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group, N.V. for Wright Medical Technology, Inc... (Kennedy, E.)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Kennedy, E.)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Anne A. Gruner's #6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/29/19. (jss)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Dana J. Ash's #5 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/29/19. (jss)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Filing fees for D. Ash and A. Gruner: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNE013714 (jss)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 \FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 4/22/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/6/2019. Discovery due by 5/22/2019. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 3/20/19. (jss)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anne A. Gruner by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, E.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dana J. Ash by Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, E.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Ryan Kennedy on behalf of Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Kennedy, E.)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Michael McGlamry re #1 Complaint. (cnd)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against Wright Medical Technology, Inc., filed by Richard Scott Judy. Filing Fee $400.00 Receipt #0424-2767854. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)[Kleeh](cnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judy v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Dana J. Ash
Represented By: Anne A. Gruner
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Kimble
Represented By: E. Ryan Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Scott Judy
Represented By: Michael L. McGlamry
Represented By: Dino S. Colombo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?