Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Jaflo, Inc.
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Jaflo, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00035
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION response to Complaint extended to August 19, 2019 by Jaflo, Inc.. (Levicoff, Edward)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jaflo, Inc. served on 7/17/2019. (Steele, Charles)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jaflo, Inc.. (Levicoff, Edward)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 8/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/2/2019. Discovery due by 9/18/2019. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/19/19. (njz)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Avrum Levicoff (Levicoff, Avrum)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Steele, Charles)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward I. Levicoff on behalf of Jaflo, Inc. (Levicoff, Edward)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jaflo, Inc. served on 6/27/2019. (Steele, Charles)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002632 re: Henry Lee Falls, III. (njz)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Henry Lee Falls, III by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Steele, Charles)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (jss)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jaflo, Inc. filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2836054 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Jaflo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaflo, Inc.
Represented By: Avrum Levicoff
Represented By: Edward I. Levicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: H. Lee Falls, III
Represented By: Charles R. Steele
Represented By: Henry Lee Falls, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?