West Virginia Highlands Conservancy et al v. Brooks Run Mining Company, LLC
Plaintiff: West Virginia Highlands Conservancy, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition and Sierra Club
Defendant: Brooks Run Mining Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00041
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting James M. Hecker's #4 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 10/18/19. (jss)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brooks Run Mining Company, LLC.(Frye, Eric)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club, West Virginia Highlands Conservancy. (Teaney, Derek)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Pro hac vice Filing fee for James Hecker: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNC002703 (jss) Modified on 9/20/2019 - corrected filed date (jss).
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Hecker by Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club, West Virginia Highlands Conservancy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear)(Becher, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Brooks Run Mining Company, LLC service accepted by SOS on 8/29/2019. (jss)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND FOR CIVIL PENALTIES against Brooks Run Mining Company, LLC filed by West Virginia Highlands Conservancy, Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Sierra Club. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2883129 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jss) Modified title and regenerated NEF on 8/20/2019 (jss).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Virginia Highlands Conservancy et al v. Brooks Run Mining Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks Run Mining Company, LLC
Represented By: Eric T. Frye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Highlands Conservancy
Represented By: John Michael Becher
Represented By: Derek O Teaney
Represented By: James M. Hecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition
Represented By: John Michael Becher
Represented By: Derek O Teaney
Represented By: James M. Hecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: John Michael Becher
Represented By: Derek O Teaney
Represented By: James M. Hecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?