The Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Premier Construction Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: Premier Construction Services LLC and Robert Riffle
Case Number: 2:2020cv00012
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 6/5/20. (njz)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by The Cincinnati Insurance Company Not. of Dismissal w/o Prejudice (Trautwein, Randall)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REMOVING ATTORNEY AS COUNSEL OF RECORD: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Remove Attorney from Pleading is hereby granted; Attorney Jill E. Lansden terminated. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 4/27/2020. (copy J. Lansden)(cnd)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION Remove Atty from Pleading re #1 Complaint, filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Verification of Attorney Admission, #2 Proposed Order Order Removing Atty)(Trautwein, Randall)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION to Jill Lansden re #1 Complaint. (copy Atty Lansden) (cnd)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Premier Construction Services LLC, Robert Riffle, filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Filing Fee $400.00 PAID. Receipt #0424-3026569. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Insurance policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)[Kleeh](cnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Premier Construction Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Construction Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Riffle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Jill E. Lansden
Represented By: Randall L. Trautwein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?