Big Brother & Holding Co., LLC v. Certified Pressure Testing, LLC
Plaintiff: Big Brother & Holding Co., LLC
Defendant: Certified Pressure Testing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00041
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Cardi, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Certified Pressure Testing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint)(Cardi, Michael)
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Big Brother & Holding Co., LLC. (Thomas, Douglas)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Certified Pressure Testing, LLC, filed by Big Brother & Holding Co., LLC.(Thomas, Douglas)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Certified Pressure Testing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Cardi, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNE015816 (jss)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 10/28/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/11/2020. Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/28/2020. (cnd)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shane D. Valenzi by Certified Pressure Testing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cardi, Michael)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Shane D. Valenzi. (jss)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Lewis County Circuit Court, (case number CK-21-2020-C-59) filed by Certified Pressure Testing, LLC. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-3123353 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court documents, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Brother & Holding Co., LLC v. Certified Pressure Testing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certified Pressure Testing, LLC
Represented By: Shane D. Valenzi
Represented By: Michael Clarke Cardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Brother & Holding Co., LLC
Represented By: Douglas Luke Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?