Smith v. Clark, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Colleen Michelle Smith
Defendant: Lewis County Commission, Jason Carey, Bo D. Hendershot, Edward W. Clark, Jr., Lewis County Sherrif's Department, Rocky Shackleford, Weston Lewis County Emergency Ambulance Authority and Nancy Ryder
Case Number: 2:2020cv00047
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 2/8/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/22/2021. Discovery due by 3/8/2021. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 1/7/21. (njz)
January 7, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Nancy Ryder, Rocky Shackleford re #12 MOTION to Dismiss amended . (Miner, Margaret)
January 7, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss amended by Nancy Ryder, Rocky Shackleford. (Miner, Margaret)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by Weston Lewis County Emergency Ambulance Authority re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended . (Miner, Margaret)
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended by Weston Lewis County Emergency Ambulance Authority. (Miner, Margaret)
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Nancy Ryder, Rocky Shackleford. (Miner, Margaret)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Nancy Ryder, Rocky Shackleford, Weston Lewis County Emergency Ambulance Authority.(Miner, Margaret)
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret L. Miner on behalf of Nancy Ryder, Rocky Shackleford, Weston Lewis County Emergency Ambulance Authority (Miner, Margaret)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Colleen Michelle Smith. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Summons, #2 Attachment Proposed Summons, #3 Attachment Proposed Summons)(Masters, Marvin)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason Carey, Edward W. Clark, Jr, Bo D. Hendershot, Lewis County Commission, Lewis County Sherrif's Department filed by Colleen Michelle Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-3154353(njz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Clark, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Michelle Smith
Represented By: Kelly Elswick-Hall
Represented By: Marvin W. Masters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis County Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo D. Hendershot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward W. Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis County Sherrif's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Shackleford
Represented By: Margaret L. Miner
Represented By: Timothy R. Linkous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weston Lewis County Emergency Ambulance Authority
Represented By: Margaret L. Miner
Represented By: Timothy R. Linkous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Ryder
Represented By: Margaret L. Miner
Represented By: Timothy R. Linkous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?