Newman v. Davis Health System, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lionel Newman
Defendant: NEC Networks, LLC and Davis Health System, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00019
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION to Remand filed by NEC Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Jones, Katherine)
August 30, 2021 Filing 25 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, Further Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by NEC Networks, LLC. (McGhee, John)
August 25, 2021 Filing 24 COURTESY COPY of Amended Motion to Transfer and Consolidate for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings Under 28 USC 1407, filed before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation re #23 Copy of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Amended Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Schedule of Actions, #3 Amended Proof of Service, #4 Envelope)(cnd)
August 20, 2021 Filing 23 COURTESY COPY of Motion to Transfer and Consolidate for Coordinated Pretrial Proceedings Under 28 USC 1407 filed before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A - Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service, #4 4:21cv363 - USDC, WDMO, #5 5:21cv536 - USDC, WDTX, #6 5:21cv523 - USDC, WDTX, #7 2:21cv1004 - USDC, EDCA, #8 4:21cv6146 - USDC, NDCA, #9 2:21cv815 - USDC, WDPA, #10 2:21cv18 - USDC, NDWV, #11 2:21cv19 - USDC, NDWV, #12 Envelope)(cnd)
August 18, 2021 Filing 22 STIPULATION re #12 First MOTION to Remand by NEC Networks, LLC. (McGhee, John)
August 17, 2021 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jones, Katherine)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Victoria E. Munian's Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 8/9/21. (jss)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Eric Y. Kizirian's Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 8/9/21. (jss)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Vonnetta L. Benjamin's Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 8/9/21. (jss)
August 9, 2021 Filing 17 Pro Hac ViceFiling fees for Victoria Munian, Vonnetta Banjamin and Eric Kizirian: $ 600.00, receipt number WVNE016879 (jss)
August 6, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Victoria E. Munian by Davis Health System, Inc.. (Yianne, Ftemkos)
August 6, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Vonnetta L. Banjamin by Davis Health System, Inc.. (Yianne, Ftemkos)
August 6, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eric Y. Kizirian by Davis Health System, Inc.. (Yianne, Ftemkos)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM In Support by Lionel Newman re #12 First MOTION to Remand . (Tiano, William)
August 2, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION to Remand by Lionel Newman. (Tiano, William)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ACCEPTING NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL [DKT. NO. #8 . Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/30/21. (jss)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, (Plaintiff's Complaint) by Davis Health System, Inc.. (Yianne, Ftemkos)
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to E. Kizirian, V. Munian and V. Benjamin. (jss)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Davis Health System, Inc. of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Yianne, Ftemkos)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEC Networks, LLC. (Jones, Katherine)
July 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Jones on behalf of NEC Networks, LLC (Jones, Katherine)
July 11, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on July 19, 2021. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVND e-filing account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after July 19, 2021. Instructions for linking your account can be found #here. PLEASE NOTE: The WVND CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 1:00 pm on Friday July 16, 2021 until 8:00 am Monday, July 19, 2021. An extension for electronic filing will be granted for all documents with court-imposed deadlines falling between 1:00 pm on Friday, July 16, 2021, and midnight on Sunday, July 18, 2021. All documents due during that period must be filed prior to 1:00 pm Friday, July 16, 2021, or on Monday, July 19, 2021. If you have any additional questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVND Clerks Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Davis Health System, Inc.. (Aliff, Robby)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 8/6/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/20/2021. Discovery due by 9/6/2021. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 7/6/21. (jss)
July 6, 2021 Filing 3 STIPULATION Stipulation Extending Answer Deadline by NEC Networks, LLC. (McGhee, John)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Candace Harlow. (jss)
July 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Upshur County, (case number 21-C-31) filed by NEC Networks, LLC. Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-3286165 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - SOS service, #3 Exhibit C - Breach Portal, #4 Exhibit D - CaptureRx Info, #5 Exhibit E - Equifax Complete Family Plan, #6 Exhibit F - Upshur County Docket, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. Davis Health System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Newman
Represented By: Tony L. O'Dell
Represented By: Cheryl A. Fisher
Represented By: William M. Tiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Networks, LLC
Represented By: John R. McGhee, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Robby J. Aliff
Represented By: Candice M. Harlow
Represented By: Eric Y. Kizirian
Represented By: Ftemkos J. Yianne
Represented By: Victoria Munian
Represented By: Vonnetta L Benjamin
Represented By: Alaina N. Crislip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?