Bradshaw et al v. The West Virginia Department of Natural Resources et al
Plaintiff: Terri Bradshaw, Blake Bradshaw, Shane Shilling and SWVWL Inc.
Defendant: The West Virginia Department of Natural Resources, Sergeant Jeff Craig, Captain Douglas Benson and Kelly Morgan
Case Number: 2:2021cv00021
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Blake Bradshaw, Terri Bradshaw, SWVWL Inc., Shane Shilling to #20 Roseboro Notice. (Disk lodged in file) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss)
September 27, 2021 Filing 24 RETURN RECEIPT as to #20 Roseboro Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to all plaintiff's on 9/22/21. (jss)
September 22, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Costs by Douglas Benson, Jeff Craig, The West Virginia Department of Natural Resources. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Morgan, Kelly)
September 21, 2021 Filing 22 RETURN RECEIPT as to #19 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to T. Bradshaw, B. Bradshaw, S. Shilling, SWVWL on 9/17/21. (jss)
September 20, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #12 Report and Recommendations. (jss)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ROSEBORO NOTICE: re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Jeff Craig, Douglas Benson, The West Virginia Department of Natural Resources. Within 21 days from the date of this Order, the pro se party shall file any opposition to the motion. (copy cmrr) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/17/21. (jss) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jss).
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF REFERRAL: The Court REFERS the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants West Virginia Department of Natural Resources, Sergeant Jeff Craig, and Captain Douglas Benson [Dkt. No. #16 to the Honorable Michael J. Aloi. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 9/16/21. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss)
September 15, 2021 Filing 18 RETURN RECEIPT as to #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to SWVWL Inc. on 9/13/21. (jss)
September 14, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Douglas Benson, Jeff Craig, The West Virginia Department of Natural Resources re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . (Morgan, Kelly)
September 14, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Douglas Benson, Jeff Craig, The West Virginia Department of Natural Resources. (Morgan, Kelly)
September 14, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN RECEIPT as to #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Shane Shilling on 9/10/21. (jss)
September 14, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Blake Bradshaw on 9/10/21. (jss)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT as to #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS SERVICE ACCEPTED as to Terri Bradshaw on 9/10/21. (jss)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Magistrate Judge Aloi RECOMMENDS that Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint and #7 Amended Complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and RECOMMENDS the Court DENY AS MOOT Plaintiffs' #3 EMERGENCY PETITION for Writ of Mandamus or Injunctive Relief. Any party may within 14 days after being served file specific written objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 9/9/2021. (copy Plaintiffs)(cnd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cnd).
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Writ MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Blake Bradshaw, Terri Bradshaw, SWVWL Inc., Shane Shilling. (Attachments: #1 Two pages received by fax that were not included in hardcopy received, #2 Envelope)(jss)
September 3, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The West Virginia Department of Natural Resources. (Morgan, Kelly)
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Morgan on behalf of Douglas Benson, Jeff Craig, The West Virginia Department of Natural Resources (Morgan, Kelly)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Writ MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Douglas Benson, Jeff Craig, The West Virginia Department of Natural Resources. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Morgan, Kelly)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Douglas Benson, Jeff Craig, The West Virginia Department of Natural Resources filed by SWVWL Inc., Terri Bradshaw, Shane Shilling, Blake Bradshaw. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jss)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Blake Bradshaw, Terri Bradshaw, SWVWL Inc., Shane Shilling (jss)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/18/21. (jss)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(jss) Modified on 8/20/2021 - (sent blank summons) (jss).
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus or MOTION for Injunctive Relief by Blake Bradshaw, Terri Bradshaw, SWVWL Inc., Shane Shilling. (jss)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number WVNC003288 (jss)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas Benson, Jeff Craig, Kelly Morgan, The West Virginia Department of Natural Resources filed by SWVWL Inc., Terri Bradshaw, Shane Shilling, Blake Bradshaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Omnibus Settlement Agreement, #2 Copy of Order from Circuit Court of Pocahontas County, #3 Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope)(jss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradshaw et al v. The West Virginia Department of Natural Resources et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Shilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SWVWL Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The West Virginia Department of Natural Resources
Represented By: Kristen V. Hammond
Represented By: Kelly Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Jeff Craig
Represented By: Kristen V. Hammond
Represented By: Kelly Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Douglas Benson
Represented By: Kristen V. Hammond
Represented By: Kelly Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?