Thunder Energy Solutions, Inc. v. Deep Roots Energy Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Thunder Energy Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Deep Roots Energy Services, LLC, James Daniel Moody and Susan Moody
Cross Defendant: Jordan Zakovec and Josh Bailey
Cross Claimant: Rick Frame
Case Number: 2:2021cv00030
Filed: December 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Ryan, Robert)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Deep Roots Energy Services, LLC. (Schillace, Gregory)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Josh Bailey, Jordan Zakovec by Rick Frame.(Varner, Debra)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Forum Selection Clause of the Subject Agreements filed by Josh Bailey, Deep Roots Energy Services, LLC, James Daniel Moody, Susan Moody, Jordan Zakovec. (Schillace, Gregory)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Forum Selection Clause of the Subject Agreements filed by Thunder Energy Solutions, Inc.. (Ryan, Robert)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thunder Energy Solutions, Inc.. (Ryan, Robert)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 2/4/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/18/2022. Discovery due by 3/4/2022. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 1/4/2022. (cnd)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rick Frame served on 12/30/2021. (Ryan, Robert)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jordan Zakovec served on 12/30/2021. (Ryan, Robert)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Susan Moody served on 12/30/2021. (Ryan, Robert)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to James Daniel Moody served on 12/30/2021. (Ryan, Robert)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Forum Selection Clause of the Subject Agreements by Josh Bailey, Deep Roots Energy Services, LLC, James Daniel Moody, Susan Moody, Jordan Zakovec. (Schillace, Gregory)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Josh Bailey, Deep Roots Energy Services, LLC, Jordan Zakovec.(Schillace, Gregory)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by James Daniel Moody, Susan Moody.(Schillace, Gregory)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Josh Bailey, Deep Roots Energy Services, LLC, Rick Frame, James Daniel Moody, Susan Moody, Jordan Zakovec, filed by Thunder Energy Solutions, Inc.. Filing Fee $402.00 PAID. Receipt #AWVNDC-3394738. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Note, #4 Exhibit 3 - Affirmation, #5 Exhibit 4 - Demand Letter)[Kleeh](cnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thunder Energy Solutions, Inc. v. Deep Roots Energy Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thunder Energy Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: R. Mitchell Moore
Represented By: Robert Edward Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deep Roots Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Gregory H. Schillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Daniel Moody
Represented By: Gregory H. Schillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Moody
Represented By: Gregory H. Schillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Jordan Zakovec
Represented By: Gregory H. Schillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Josh Bailey
Represented By: Gregory H. Schillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Rick Frame
Represented By: Debra Tedeschi Varner
Represented By: James A Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?