Cochran v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Rita Cochran
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi S.A., Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00013
Filed: October 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Kleeh
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER STAYING CASE. The parties are DIRECTED to file a status report on or before May 24, 2024, informing the Court of the case's settlement status. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 12/1/2023. (jb)
November 29, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Settlement Pending and Request to Stay Proceedings by Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Proctor, Jason)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hace vice for Karen Barth Menzies filed by Rita Cochran Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 11/29/2023. (cmd)
November 28, 2023 Filing 20 Filing fee: Pro Hac Vice fee received for Karen Menzies $ 200.00, receipt number 200019477. (mas)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher S. McRae. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 11/15/2023. (mas)
November 15, 2023 Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER For good cause, the Court VACATES the Order at ECF No. 16. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 11/15/23. (sg)
November 15, 2023 Filing 17 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION sent to Amy R. Malone, counsel of record for defendants. (mas)
November 14, 2023 Filing 16 VACATED BASED ON 18 filed on 11/15/2023 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear of Karen Barth Menzies Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Rita Cochran. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas S Kleeh on 11/14/2023. (mas) Modified on 11/15/2023 (cmd).
November 13, 2023 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice filing fee received for Chris McRae #11 Motion in the amount of $ 200.00 (Receipt Number 200019436). (mas) (Main Document 15 replaced, modified docket text, NEF regenerated on 11/15/2023) (cnd)
November 8, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for ,Karen Barth Menzies and Responsible Local Attorney by Rita Cochran. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reed, Kelly) Modified on 11/15/2023 to add name of phv atty. (cmd).
November 7, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi S.A. for Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc... (Proctor, Jason)
November 7, 2023 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi S.A. for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.. (Proctor, Jason)
November 6, 2023 Filing 11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Chris McRae Other Document filed by Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Proctor, Jason) Modified on 11/15/2023 Attorney used wrong event- clerk corrected to motion (cmd).
November 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason A. Proctor on behalf of Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Proctor, Jason)
October 27, 2023 Filing 9 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION sent to all counsel of record. (mas) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/30/2023) (mas).
October 27, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-10527. (mas)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to Northern District of West Virginia. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (Filed at Doc. 16511, MDL 2740)(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Britton, Mary) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.]
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.]
October 11, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Aventis Pharma S.A., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6406401) filed by Rita Cochran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)Attorney Karen Barth Menzies added to party Rita Cochran(pty:pla).(Menzies, Karen) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/27/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cochran v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi U.S. Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Amy R. Malone
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Morgan Elizabeth Villers
Represented By: Jason A. Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aventis Pharma S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Amy R. Malone
Represented By: Jason A. Proctor
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Morgan Elizabeth Villers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher S McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Amy R. Malone
Represented By: Jason A. Proctor
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Morgan Elizabeth Villers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Cochran
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Amy M Zeman
Represented By: Darin Lee Schanker
Represented By: Eric H Gibbs
Represented By: Jere Kyle Bachus
Represented By: John Christopher Elliott
Represented By: Kelly R. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?