Jordan et al v. Entertainment of the Eastern Panhandle, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Arielle Jordan and Patrice Ruffin |
Defendant: |
Entertainment of the Eastern Panhandle, Inc., The Legz Club, Inc., Legz Morgan Town, Inc. and Troy W. Erickson |
Counter_claimant: |
Legz Morgan Town, Inc., Troy W. Erickson, Entertainment of the Eastern Panhandle, Inc. and The Legz Club, Inc. |
Counter_defendant: |
Arielle Jordan and Patrice Ruffin |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv00019 |
Filed: |
March 8, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Martinsburg Office |
County: |
Berkeley |
Presiding Judge: |
John Preston Bailey |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 23, 2014 |
Filing
173
ORDER Granting 168 Motion to Reopen Case and to Enter Consent Judgment. The Plaintiff may enter the consent judgment for $336,000 pursuant to Section X(c) of the Second Revised Settlement Agreement. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 1/23/2014. (cmd)
|
November 9, 2012 |
Filing
126
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting 95 Plaintiff's Motion for Rule 23 Class Certification. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 11/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Class Action)(cmd)
|
April 25, 2012 |
Filing
79
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 76 Motion for Reconsideration re 74 Order on Motion and 73 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court hereby REINSTATES the defendants counterclaims for breach of contract and unjust enrichment to the extent that they seek an offset of performance fees against any award of minimum wages. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 4/25/2012. (cmd)
|
March 7, 2012 |
Filing
74
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 27 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FACILITATE IDENTIFICATION AND NOTIFICATION OF SIMILARLY SITUATED EMPLOYEES. This Court hereby ORDERS the plaintiff to submit a revised proposed Notice to this Court within 14 days of the entry of this Order. The Court hereby ORDERS the defendants to produce, within 14 days of the date of this Order, the full names, the last known work and home addresses, the last known phone numbers, and the last known e-mail addresses of each and every individual who worked for the defendants as an exotic dancer in each of the defendants three West Virginia dance clubs at any time from January 12, 2009, to the present. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/7/2012. (cmd)
|
January 5, 2012 |
Filing
63
ORDER Granting 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Equitable Tolling of the FLSA Statute of Limitations. The Court hereby tolls the FLSA statute of limitations until such time as the Court renders a decision on 27 plaintiffs Motion to Facilitate Identification and Notification of Similarly Situated Employees. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 1/5/2012. (cmd)
|
November 23, 2011 |
Filing
53
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION 35 TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMS. Counts II and IV may proceed; Counts I and III are dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/23/2011. (tlg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Jordan et al v. Entertainment of the Eastern Panhandle, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Legz Morgan Town, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Harry A. Smith, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Troy W. Erickson |
Represented By: |
Harry A. Smith, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Entertainment of the Eastern Panhandle, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Harry A. Smith, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: The Legz Club, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Harry A. Smith, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Arielle Jordan |
Represented By: |
Garry G. Geffert |
Represented By: |
Gregg C. Greenberg |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Patrice Ruffin |
Represented By: |
Garry G. Geffert |
Represented By: |
Gregg C. Greenberg |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Arielle Jordan |
Represented By: |
Gregg C. Greenberg |
Represented By: |
Garry G. Geffert |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Patrice Ruffin |
Represented By: |
Gregg C. Greenberg |
Represented By: |
Garry G. Geffert |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Entertainment of the Eastern Panhandle, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Harry A. Smith, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: The Legz Club, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Harry A. Smith, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Legz Morgan Town, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Harry A. Smith, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Troy W. Erickson |
Represented By: |
Harry A. Smith, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?