A.Hak Industrial Services BV et al v. Techcorr USA, LLC

Plaintiff: A.Hak Intank Services, LLC and A.Hak Industrial Services BV
Defendant: Techcorr USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00074
Filed: August 31, 2011
Court: West Virginia Northern District Court
Office: Martinsburg Office
County: Morgan
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2014 209 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER SUSTAINING OBJECTION 196 AND REVERSING IN PART MAGISTRATE JUDGE SEIBERT'S JUNE 9, 2014 180 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 6/30/2014. (tlg)
September 2, 2014 251 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER REVERSING IN PART MAGISTRATE COURT'S JULY 21, 2014 ORDER. The Court SUSTAINS IN PART TechCorrs 243 Objections and REVERSES IN PART 239 Magistrate Judge Trumbles July 21, 2014 Order Denying in Part and Granting in Part TechCorrs 220 Fourth Motion to Compel. The Court ORDERS that the A.Hak parties comply with requests for production 12 and 14 no later than fourteen days of the filing of this Order. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 9/2/2014. (cwm)
September 16, 2014 267 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING A.HAK'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER SEPTEMBER 2, 2014 ORDER REVERSING IN PART MAGISTRATE COURT ORDER denying 263 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 9/16/2014. (cwm)
December 18, 2014 293 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 229 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING IN PART 229 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Court GRANTS the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count One - Breach of Contract. The Court GRANTS IN PART the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Two - Tortious Interference. The Court GRANTS the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Four - Lanham Act Violations. The Court GRANTS the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Five - Declaratory Judgment . The Court GRANTS the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Six - Trade Secret Misappropriation. The Court DENIES the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Seven - Aiding and Abetting. The Court DENIES AS MOOT the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Eight - Cancellation of Trademark Registrations because TechCorr has withdrawn this claim. The Court GRANTS the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Nine -Conspiracy. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 12/18/14. (njz)
December 19, 2014 296 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 229 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING IN PART 229 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The Court GRANTS the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count One - Breach of Contract. The Court GRANTS IN PART the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Two - Tortious Interference. The Court GRANTS the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Four - Lanham Act Violations. The Court GRANTS the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Five - Declaratory J udgment. The Court GRANTS the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Six - Trade Secret Misappropriation.The Court DENIES the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Seven - Aiding and Abetting. The Court DENIES AS MOOT the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Eight - Cancellation of Trademark Registrations because TechCorr has withdrawn this claim. The Court GRANTS the Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count Nine - Conspiracy. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 12/19/14. (njz)
September 18, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO DISCOVERY granting in part and denying in part 59 First Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 9/18/2013. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.Hak Industrial Services BV et al v. Techcorr USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.Hak Intank Services, LLC
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Represented By: Michael T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.Hak Industrial Services BV
Represented By: Michael T. Smith
Represented By: Gordon H. Copland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Techcorr USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.