Long et al v. M&M Transportation, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Edy Long, Christopher Emmett Long and Christopher Tyler Long |
Defendant: |
Miller & Sons Auto and Truck Repair, Inc., M&M Transportation, LLC, Kevin E. Miller, Kenneth Andrew Miller, Jr. and Peggy Miller |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00065 |
Filed: |
June 11, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Martinsburg Office |
County: |
Hampshire |
Presiding Judge: |
Gina M. Groh |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 5, 2014 |
Filing
159
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REVISED MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: denying as moot 128 MOTION f or Summary Judgment PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 56; denying 130 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendants M&M Transportation, LLC and Miller & Sons Auto and Truck Repair, Inc; and granting 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court DISMISSES this action WITH PREJUDICE. The Court further ORDERS that this case be STRICKEN from this Courts active docket. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 9/5/2014. (cwm)
|
January 22, 2014 |
Filing
65
ORDER Confirming Pronounced Order of the Court Granting in Part and Denying in Part 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Granting 51 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to submit to Rule 35 Examinations. Written objections due within fourteen days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Seibert on 1/22/2014. (cmd)
|
December 27, 2013 |
Filing
41
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS denying 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(C). Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 12/27/2013. (cwm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?