Knisely v. National Better Living Association, Inc et al
Plaintiff: David Knisely
Defendant: National Better Living Association, Inc, American Medical and Life Insurance Company and John/Jane Does
Case Number: 3:2014cv00015
Filed: January 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Martinsburg Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Gina M. Groh
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING NATIONAL BETTER LIVING ASSOCIATION, INC.'S MOTION 175 TO DISMISS IN PART. Defendant National Better Living Association, Inc. is DISMISSED from this action. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 7/22/2015. (tlg)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING AS MOOT MOTION 80 FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, GRANTING IN PART MOTION 147 FOR LEAVE TO FILE REVISED AMENDED COMPLAINT, DENYING RULE 12(b)(2) MOTION 91 TO DISMISS, AND DENYING AS MOOT RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff has until 5/7/2015 to file a revised version of the amended complaint attached to his Motion in compliance with this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 4/23/2015. (tlg)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION 153 TO UNSEAL. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 3/27/2015. (tlg)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER SUSTAINING OBJECTIONS AND REVERSING IN PART MAGISTRATE COURT'S FEBRUARY 11, 2015 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 3/11/2015. (tlg)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION 136 FOR LEAVE TO SERVE ADDITIONAL INTERROGATORIES. NBLA shall file its responses by 3/13/2015. Objections are due within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 2/11/2015. (tlg)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART NATIONAL BETTER LIVING ASSOCIATION, INC.'S MOTION TO DIMISS, GRANTING IN PART AMERICAN MEDIAL AND LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS, AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTI ON TO AMEND the Court GRANTS IN PART NBLAs 21 Motion to Dismiss, GRANTS NBLA leave to brief its Rule 12(b)(2) motion, GRANTS IN PART AMLIs 40 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and DENIES the Plaintiffs Motion to Amend his complaint raised in the event. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 8/19/2014. (cwm)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING NATIONAL BETTER LIVING ASSOCIATION, INC.'S MOTION 24 TO STAY DISCOVERY AND ALL OTHER PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES PENDING DISPOSITION OF ITS 21 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by District Judge Gina M. Groh on 2/26/2014. (tlg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knisely v. National Better Living Association, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Knisely
Represented By: Laura C. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Better Living Association, Inc
Represented By: Lewis E. Hassett
Represented By: Eric A. Larson
Represented By: John R. Merinar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical and Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph L. Caltrider
Represented By: Ronald S. Stadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?