Thomas v. Singh et al

Plaintiff: Matthew Thomas
Defendant: Michael Jaymes Blough, Surender S. Bhatti and Sudhar Singh
Case Number: 3:2018cv00150
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 CROSSCLAIM against Michael Jaymes Blough, filed by Sudhar Singh.(Kennedy, Gregory)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 CROSSCLAIM against Michael Jaymes Blough, filed by Surender S. Bhatti.(Kennedy, Gregory)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sudhar Singh.(Kennedy, Gregory)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Surender S. Bhatti.(Kennedy, Gregory)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Surender S. Bhatti. (Kennedy, Gregory)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sudhar Singh. (Kennedy, Gregory)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory E. Kennedy on behalf of Sudhar Singh (Kennedy, Gregory)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory E. Kennedy on behalf of Surender S. Bhatti (Kennedy, Gregory)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sudhar Singh served on 10/26/2018. (cwm)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Surender S. Bhatti served on 10/26/2018. (cwm)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 11/01/2018. (cwm)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Michael Jaymes Blough.(Gwaltney, Paul)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Surender S. Bhatti, Michael Jaymes Blough, Sudhar Singh, filed by Matthew Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2669183(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Thomas
Represented By: F. Samuel Byrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jaymes Blough
Represented By: Paul W. Gwaltney, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surender S. Bhatti
Represented By: Gregory E. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sudhar Singh
Represented By: Gregory E. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?