S.L. v. Berkeley Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: S.L.
Defendant: West Virginia University Hospitals, Inc., Berkeley Medical Center, West Virginia United Health Systems and City Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Berkeley Medical Center, A subsidiary of West Virginia University Hospitals-East, Inc., d/b/a WV University Healthcare
Case Number: 3:2018cv00162
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua K Boggs (Boggs, Joshua)
December 3, 2018 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by City Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Berkeley Medical Center, A subsidiary of West Virginia University Hospitals-East, Inc., d/b/a WV University Healthcare identifying Corporate Parent West Virginia University Hospitals-East, Inc. for City Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Berkeley Medical Center, A subsidiary of West Virginia University Hospitals-East, Inc., d/b/a WV University Healthcare.. (Boggs, Joshua) (Main Document 20 replaced on 12/3/2018 with PDF version) (tlg).
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by City Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Berkeley Medical Center, A subsidiary of West Virginia University Hospitals-East, Inc., d/b/a WV University Healthcare. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boggs, Joshua) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/3/2018 with PDF version) (tlg).
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 11/27/2018. (tlg)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 11/27/2018. (tlg)
November 26, 2018 Filing 16 PHV Filing fee for Samantha Crane: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNM001420. (cmd)
November 15, 2018 Filing 15 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by S.L.. (White, Shawna)
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawna M. P. White on behalf of S.L. (White, Shawna)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to West Virginia University Hospitals, Inc. served on 10/23/2018. (White, Shawna)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to West Virginia United Health Systems served on 10/23/2018. (White, Shawna)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Berkeley Medical Center served on 10/22/2018. (White, Shawna)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by S.L.. (White, Shawna)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Berkeley Medical Center, filed by S.L..(White, Shawna)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE REFERENCE LIST UNDER SEAL. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 10/11/2018. Copy to counsel of record.(tlg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by S.L.. Amendment to #1 Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed summons, #2 Attachment proposed summons)(White, Shawna)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 PAPERLESS NOTICE: Case filing began in CM/ECF shell case, with filing fee being paid through pay.gov on 10/5/2018. However, filer failed to complete filing process, following receipt of payment. Clerk's office notified filer of the incomplete document filing and notice of removal/complaint was received on 10/9/2018. (tlg)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Berkeley Medical Center, West Virginia United Health Systems, West Virginia University Hospitals, Inc., filed by S.L. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2681227(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.L. v. Berkeley Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia University Hospitals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia United Health Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Hospital, Inc. d/b/a Berkeley Medical Center, A subsidiary of West Virginia University Hospitals-East, Inc., d/b/a WV University Healthcare
Represented By: Joshua K Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.L.
Represented By: Shawna M. P. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?